Weller v. Scout Analytics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Scott Weller
Defendant: Scout Analytics, Inc., ServiceSource International, Inc. and Mike Smerklo
Case Number: 3:2015cv03170
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 3/9/2017, file an amended complaint or otherwise demonstrate good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/2/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
January 31, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 31 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before February 20, 2017. It is further ordered that the Case Management Conference presently set for February 2, 2017 is VACATED as moot. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila 1/31/2017. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
July 25, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. It is hereby ordered that: Having reviewed 51 Joint Case Management Statement, the Court finds that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference set f or 7/28/2016, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 9/29/2016 for Initial Case Management Conference in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/25/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
May 23, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Case Management Conference scheduled for June 2, 2016, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on July 28, 2016. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before July 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/23/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weller v. Scout Analytics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Weller
Represented By: John David Du Wors
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scout Analytics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServiceSource International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Smerklo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?