Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Defendant: Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2015cv03186
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION RE: ECF NO. 59 . Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 11/2/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order re: In Camera Review. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2018. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Vacating Hearing and Ordering Supplemental Briefing; supplemental briefs due by 6/1/2016. Responses due by 6/15/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/16/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REQUEST for Clarification; Joint Response due by 5/11/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/3/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER:Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion due by 2/18/2016 Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 3/17/2016 Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2016 Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/29/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Hanni Meena Fakhoury
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?