181 Sales, Inc. v. Karcher North America, Inc.

Plaintiff: 181 Sales, Inc.
Defendant: Karcher North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03191
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DATE TO FILE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS filed by 181 Sales, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 2, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 6, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 44 Motion in Limine; granting 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
June 7, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by 181 Sales, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 3, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER CONTINUING DATE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by 181 Sales, Inc. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 12, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE FACT DISCOVERY re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Complete Fact Discovery filed by 181 Sales, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 2, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 44 MOTION in Limine Defendant Karcher North America, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion in Limine Regarding Choice of Law filed by Karcher North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 2, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
March 9, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLETE FACT DISCOVERY filed by 181 Sales, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 8, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER POSTPONING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request For Order Postponing Deadline to Complete Alternative Dispute Resolution filed by Karcher North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 8, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
November 10, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by 181 Sales, Inc. and Karcher North America [AMENDED] filed by 181 Sales, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 10, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 29, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2015. Expert disclosures due 3/11/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 3/25/2016. Expert rebuttal disclosures due 4/1/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 4/25/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2016. Pr etrial conference statement due 7/12/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Bench Trial set for 8/15/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 181 Sales, Inc. v. Karcher North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 181 Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Todd Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karcher North America, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Michael Douglas
Represented By: Daniel J. Herling
Represented By: Mina Nasseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?