Neuroth et al v. Mendocino County et al
Plaintiff: James Neuroth and Joan C. Nygren
Defendant: Mendocino County, Thomas D. Allman, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Taylor Fithian, M.D. and Jennifer L. Caudillo
Case Number: 3:2015cv03226
Filed: July 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 383 Dismissing Willits Defendants filed by James Neuroth ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/3/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/9/2019 AT 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/28/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 372 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/21/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 352 Motion for Leave to File; denying 353 Motion for Leave to File. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 357 to Continue Trial and Pretrial Dates filed by James Neuroth. Further Case Management Conference and Trial Setting Conference set for 12/6/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Pretrial Conference previously set for 12/6/2018 has been continued to 2/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/31/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 340 TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AND OTHER DATES. Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/29/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND THE PAGE LIMIT FOR COUNTY DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION, AND WITHDRAWAL OF RELATED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/16/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 231 TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AND OTHER DATES. Jury Selection/Trial set for 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting re 227 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR FORENSIC EXAMINATION OF CAUDILLO EVALUATIONS filed by James Neuroth. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 11/20/2017. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting 143 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 144 Discovery Letter Brief. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Trial set for 2/26/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 129 to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 10/27/2016 Continued to 12/8/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re 104 MOTION Request for a Discovery Telephone Conference with Magistrate Judge Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/8/2016. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Amended ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss. Amended as to signature and second amended complaint filing deadline. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/29/2016. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neuroth et al v. Mendocino County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Neuroth
Represented By: Genevieve K. Guertin
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: T. Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan C. Nygren
Represented By: Genevieve K. Guertin
Represented By: Michael J. Haddad
Represented By: T. Kennedy Helm, IV
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendocino County
Represented By: Anne L. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas D. Allman
Represented By: Anne L. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Fithian, M.D.
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. Caudillo
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?