Chan, et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Bertram Chan and Marie Chan
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2015cv03251
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 25 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/13/2016. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
December 8, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR THE UNITED STATES TO ANSWER AND CONTINUING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 20 ). Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/8/2015. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
September 15, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 13 MOTION TO SET ASIDE 11 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/15/2015. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chan, et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertram Chan
Represented By: Troy Douglas Renkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Chan
Represented By: Troy Douglas Renkemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?