Hernandez v. Grounds

Petitioner: Rodrigo Vasquez Hernandez
Respondent: Randy Grounds
Case Number: 3:2015cv03279
Filed: July 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/25/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 24, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing habeas petition without prejudice. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/24/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
July 29, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 19 Request for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall show cause as to why case should not be dismissed by 09/15/15. Petitioner's response shall include authority to support the proposition that authorization to file a successive petition may be obtained after the petition has already been filed. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 21, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to show cause as to why case should not be dismissed. Petitioner to file response by 07/31/15. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/21/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodrigo Vasquez Hernandez
Represented By: William Lionel Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?