Bain et al v. United Healthcare Inc., et al
Plaintiff: David Bain, Danya Bain and Alaina Bain
Defendant: United Healthcare Inc. and Sagent Advisors Inc. Group Health Plan
Case Number: 3:2015cv03305
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 116 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Nontaxable Expenses. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United Healthcare Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/21/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE re 74 filed by United Healthcare Inc., Motions terminated: 68 MOTION to Stay filed by Alaina Bain, Danya Bain, David Bain, 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed b y United Healthcare Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/30/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/13/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR THE FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND TO THE DISMISSAL OF UNITED HEALTHCARE INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Alaina Bain, Danya Bain, David Bain. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/23/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 to Reschedule MSJ Hearing Dates filed by United Healthcare Inc. Motion (MSJ) Hearing reset from 5/11/2017 to 5/25/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/8/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 57 Joint Letter of November 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/9/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN filed by United Healthcare Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/28/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO SUBMIT JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN PER Dkt. Entry 52 filed by Alaina Bain, Danya Bain, David Bain. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/26/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 First Stipulated Request to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Alaina Bain, Danya Bain, David Bain. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bain et al v. United Healthcare Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bain
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danya Bain
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaina Bain
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Represented By: Lisa Sharon Serebin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Greg L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagent Advisors Inc. Group Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?