McCarthy v. Brennan

Plaintiff: Kian R. McCarthy
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 3:2015cv03308
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER.Pretrial Conference set for 7/5/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 7/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisc o before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 7/23/2018 to 8/3/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/13/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
January 27, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 44 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
July 6, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 38 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 30 Motion to Dismiss. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
March 14, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 15 Motion to Dismiss.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kian R. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?