Purity Organic, LLC v. Natural Flavors, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Purity Organic, LLC
Defendant: Natural Flavors, Inc. and Elan Chemical Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03310
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/1/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
June 27, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant Elan Chemical Company, Inc., re 90 Notice of Settlement filed by Purity Organic, LLC. Elan Chemical Company, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/27/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 22, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiff's response to OSC 78 , Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 79 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/22/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 17, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/22/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/17/2016. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
September 18, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Natural Flavors, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/18/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 17, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Substitution of Attorney for Defendant Elan Chemical Company, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/17/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purity Organic, LLC v. Natural Flavors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purity Organic, LLC
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Represented By: Ellen Lynn Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natural Flavors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elan Chemical Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?