Anna M. Sanzone-Ortiz v. Aetna Health of California, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anna M. Sanzone-Ortiz
Defendant: Aetna Health of California, Inc. and Aetna Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03334
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/19/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
August 24, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting Defendants' 41 Motion to Compel by Hon. William H. Orrick. This case is STAYED pending arbitration. The parties shall submit a case status update to the Court every 180 days informing me about the status of the arbitration. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
February 22, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 STIPULATION Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Pending Motions. Deadlines reset as to 26 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint. Plaintiff will file a single consolidated brief that will serve as a reply in support of her Motion and opposition to Aetna's cross motion to compel arbitration on or before 3/14/2016. Aetna will file a reply in support of the cross motion to compel arbitration on or before4/5/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
December 22, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 14 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Hon. William H. Orrick. Ortiz's agreement with Aetna requires arbitration. Defendants' motion to compel arbitration is GRANTED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
October 7, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Resetting Deadlines as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration.Responses due by 10/26/2015. Replies due by 11/16/2015. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/7/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anna M. Sanzone-Ortiz v. Aetna Health of California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna M. Sanzone-Ortiz
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: Jordan M. Lewis
Represented By: Teresa Susan Renaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Health of California, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Inc.
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?