Andre Petre v. City of San Leandro

Plaintiff: Andre Petre
Defendant: City of San Leandro
Case Number: 3:2015cv03344
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Request for Waiver of Timothy Perry's Appearance at July 8, 2016 Settlement Conference 39 . Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
February 12, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER.Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 5/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 5/30/2017 to 6/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/12/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
January 4, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andre Petre v. City of San Leandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Petre
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Leandro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?