Aleut Support Services, LLC v. Stationary Engineers, Local 39 et al

Plaintiff: Aleut Support Services, LLC
Defendant: Stationary Engineers, Local 39, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund, Stationary Engineers Local 39 Annuity Trust Fund and Stationary Engineers Local 39 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Case Number: 3:2015cv03348
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
March 16, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Stipulation to Further Stay Proceedings; Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
November 19, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO FURTHER STAY PROCEEDINGS, ENLARGE TIME FOR FILING A RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER - The time for Defendants Trust Funds to respond to the Complaint in this matter is enlarged from Dec ember 28, 2015 to March 11, 2016; the time for Defendant Union to respond to the Complaint in this matter is enlarged from January 11, 2016 to March 11, 2016; and the Case Management Conference currently scheduled for January 19, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. is removed from the Court's calendar. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
September 28, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, as modified, 31 STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS, ENLARGE TIME FOR FILING A RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT AND VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference continued to 1/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2016.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/28/2015. jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 18, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 16 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
August 18, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON 16 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.Motion Hearing advanced to 9/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Response and reply deadlines remain unchanged. The parties are encouraged to meet and confer in advance of further briefing to attempt to resolve this procedural matter. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/18/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aleut Support Services, LLC v. Stationary Engineers, Local 39 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleut Support Services, LLC
Represented By: Richard Hill
Represented By: Jason Evan Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stationary Engineers, Local 39
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stationary Engineers Local 39 Pension Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stationary Engineers Local 39 Annuity Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stationary Engineers Local 39 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?