Jason Call v. SA Matt Badgley et al
Plaintiff: Jason Call
Defendant: SA Matt Badgley, SA Jack Nelsen, Bureau of Narcotics Enforcement, Officer Wayne Hanson and Humboldt County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 3:2015cv03353
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 AMENDED 106 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 77 , 94 ) MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN PART AND REMANDING REMAINING STATE LAW CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/19/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 77 , 94 ) MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN PART AND DISMISSING REMAINING STATE LAW CLAIMS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 90 Stipulation TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS CERVELLI, HELMAN, LETENDRE AND MAKI. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER 79 GRANTING STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Responses due by 3/10/2017; Replies due by 3/24/2017. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/22/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 75 Stipulation For Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 72 Motion for Protective Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 66 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 12/30/2016; Motions due by 3/23/2017; Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2017 03:00 PM.; Jury Selection /Jury Trial (10-Day) set for 6/26/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/14/2016. ( 64 JOINT CASE SCHEDULE AND (PROPOSED) ORDER Motions terminated.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2016)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 50 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Cory Persing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 48 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 43 Stipulation to Dismiss California DOJ/BNE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 29 Stipulation TO AMEND COMPLAINT (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jason Call v. SA Matt Badgley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Call
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA Matt Badgley
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA Jack Nelsen
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Narcotics Enforcement
Represented By: Wilfred T. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Wayne Hanson
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humboldt County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?