Avendano-Ruiz v. City of Sebastopol, et al

Plaintiff: Nahum Avendano-Ruiz
Defendant: City of Sebastopol, Sebastopol Police Department and Jeffrey Weaver
Case Number: 3:2015cv03371
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2017 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING 95 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT THREE OF THE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
February 6, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Status Conference Set for March 23, 2017. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 3/23/2017 Continued to 4/6/2017 at 11:00 AM to held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/6/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
October 4, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 68 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
June 27, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 59 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration and Certification for Interlocutory Review. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 23, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Discovery Procedures by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
May 26, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 43 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
April 12, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 48 to Continue Briefing and Hearing of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification until after Ruling on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/12/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 7, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 41 to Continue Briefing and Hearing of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
November 5, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 4/21/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/5/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
July 24, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/24/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avendano-Ruiz v. City of Sebastopol, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nahum Avendano-Ruiz
Represented By: Donald Webster Cook
Represented By: Alicia Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sebastopol
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastopol Police Department
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Weaver
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?