Zelkind v. Flywheel Networks, Inc.

Plaintiff: Yana Zelkind
Defendant: Flywheel Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03375
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE AND REFERRING ATTORNEY ALEXANDER JOHNSON TO THE STANDING COMMITTEE ON PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/24/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
April 22, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/17/2016 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2016.. Signed by Judge William Orrick on 04/22/2016. (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
October 16, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION. This action is STAYED. The parties shall jointly advise me within 10 days of (i) the arbitrator's determination that the claims are not arbitrable, (ii) the arbitrator's a ward, in the event that the arbitrator determines that the claims are arbitrable, or (iii) the settlement of this dispute. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report every six months, beginning six months from the date of this Order, apprising the Court of the status of the arbitration. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 5, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Stipulation - Case Management Conference continued to 11/3/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/05/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 17, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S 23 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a declaration no later than 9/21/2015. Hearing Reset for 10/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/17/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
August 5, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/5/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zelkind v. Flywheel Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yana Zelkind
Represented By: Alexander Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flywheel Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Michele Cooper
Represented By: Rachel Mary Pusey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?