Von Bozzay v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Plaintiff: George Von Bozzay
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03376
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 35 Seventh Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/27/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
December 18, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 33 Sixth Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/18/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
November 30, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 31 Fifth Stipulation filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/30/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
October 27, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 21 Fourth Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/27/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
September 18, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 19 Third Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/18/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
August 27, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 14 Second Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/27/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 14, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 8 Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/14/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Von Bozzay v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Von Bozzay
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Megan Catherine Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?