Holmby v. Cardinal Logistics Management Corporation

Plaintiff: Justin Holmby
Defendant: Cardinal Logistics Management Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv03382
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
March 21, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 31 Joint Notice of Tentative Settlement and Joint Request to Vacate Existing Dates. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/21/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
January 11, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting leave to file first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmby v. Cardinal Logistics Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Holmby
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Represented By: William David Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Logistics Management Corporation
Represented By: Drew Robert Hansen
Represented By: Kenneth E Johnson
Represented By: Walter Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?