Vargas v. Delivery Outsourcing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Salvador Vargas
Defendant: Delivery Outsourcing, LLC, Luggage Services and Logistics, LLC and Bags, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03408
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to file stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 9, 2016. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
March 14, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 19 Motion to Compel; granting 20 Motion for Joinder. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
January 28, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 19, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND RELATED DEADLINES AND HEARING filed by Salvador Vargas. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
November 4, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 12/4/2015. Fact discovery cut-off 7/15/2016. Expert disclosures 6/24/2016. Expert rebuttal 7/15/2016. Expert discovery cut-off 7/29/2016. Deadline to file dispositive motions 8/19/2016. Pretrial conference statement due 12/6/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 1/9/2017 - 1/23/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 4, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Delivery Outsourcing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delivery Outsourcing, LLC
Represented By: Maureen K. Bogue
Represented By: Noah A. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luggage Services and Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Elaine Susan Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bags, Inc.
Represented By: Elaine Susan Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Vargas
Represented By: Arlo Garcia Uriarte
Represented By: Un Kei Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?