Sam Razo v. Timec Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sam Razo
Defendant: Timec Company, Inc. and Transfield Services, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03414
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/4/2018. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 72 Motion for Attorney Fees. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2016. Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge to be conducted within 90 days.(mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Discovery Order re 31 Plaintiff's RFP Nos. 33-38. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/21/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Exhibit List due by 11/23/2016. Motions due by 8/4/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2017 10:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 1/23/2017. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2017. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/20/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING: 24 STIPULATION To Continue Mediation Deadline. Mediation deadline continued to 3/18/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/20/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Deadline to Seek Leave to Amend Pleadings: 1/15/2016Discovery due by 4/12/2016 Dispositive Motion Deadline: 5/12/2016Dispositive Motion Hearing Date: 6/16/2016Jury Trial set for 10/31/2016 Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/30/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/24/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING CMC AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/11/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sam Razo v. Timec Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Razo
Represented By: Navruz Avloni
Represented By: Nicole Corinne Moskowitz
Represented By: Lawrence Anthony Organ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timec Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transfield Services, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?