American Beverage Association et al v. City and County of San Francisco

Plaintiff: American Beverage Association, California Retailers Association and California State Outdoor Advertising Association
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2015cv03415
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 97 Continuing Case Management Conference filed by American Beverage Association. Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
July 14, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER re 84 Letter filed by American Beverage Association, California State Outdoor Advertising Association, California Retailers Association, 83 Letter filed by City and County of San Francisco. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that lead counsel for both parties shall meet and confer in person in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco. The meet and confer shall take place during the week of July 25, 2016. Counsel shall contact the undersigneds Courtroom Deputy, Karen Hom, at (415) 522-2035 to arrange a date and time for the meet-and-confer session. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/14/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 7, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 69 Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
June 3, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING COUNT I AND COUNT II OF COMPLAINT filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 24, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order to Expedite the Briefing Schedule and Forgo a Hearing for Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by American Beverage Association. Opposition due 5/31/16. Reply due 6/2/16. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/24/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 17, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 50 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
January 22, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
December 21, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re 48 filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
October 30, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 Continuing Initial Case Management Conference and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Beverage Association. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2015. Case Management Conference reset for 12/17/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/30/15. Motion for preliminary injunction set for 4/7/2016 at 1:30 p.m.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
August 25, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Non-Enforcement During Pendency of the Case filed by American Beverage Association. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 24, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 Stipulation to extend time to answer filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Beverage Association et al v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Beverage Association
Represented By: Michael E. Bern
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: John S. Cooper
Represented By: James K. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Retailers Association
Represented By: Thomas S. Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California State Outdoor Advertising Association
Represented By: Joshua David Dick
Represented By: Theodore B Olson
Represented By: Jacob T Spencer
Represented By: Charles Joseph Stevens
Represented By: Andrew Santo Tulumello
Represented By: Helgi C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Goldman
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?