Cave Consulting Group, Inc. v. OptumInsight, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Cave Consulting Group, Inc.
Defendant: OptumInsight, Inc.,
Case Number: 3:2015cv03424
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 373 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 358 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and providing notice of intent to consider granting summary judgment sua sponte. A briefing schedule will be addressed at the case management conference. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Redacted public version of 354 ORDER regarding 244 280 312 Motions for Summary Judgment and 305 306 Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony, signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 28, 2019. Filed September 18, 2019. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Notice of filing order under seal. Proposed redactions due September 11, 2019. Updated joint case management statement due September 27, 2019. A case management conference will occur on October 4, 2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 28, 2019. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding 268 Discovery Letter Brief. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 (****Disregard - filed in wrong case - Disregard ****) Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 15-3424. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/31/2018. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018) Modified on 1/31/2018 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. OptumInsight shall file redacted versions no later than January 10, 2018. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 230 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. This order supersedes the Court's previous 229 Order as to Exhibits 1, 3, and 6. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero regarding 209 Discovery Letter Brief. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 167 Motion to Stay. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 AMENDED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion to Compel. This amends and supersedes 151 the Court's October 25, 2016 Order to reflect the Court's determination that it is suitable for interlocutory appeal. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 29, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion to Compel. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 132 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiff shall file the documents at issue in the pubic record no later than October 12, 2016. Plaintiff is also instructed to file an unredacted version of its motion to compel as required by the Court's previous 128 Order. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 124 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiff shall file the materials at issue in the public record no earlier than September 27, 2016 and no later than October 3, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 103 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED re 94 Supplemental Brief/Revised Schedule for Resolution of Privilege and Work Product Issues filed by Cave Consulting Group, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Franc isco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C Spero on 6/10/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 56 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint no later than May 13, 2016. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying as moot 34 Motion to Dismiss and vacating November 6, 2015 hearing. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING re 37 Stipulation For Extension of Time For Plaintiff to File a Response to Dft's Motion to Dismiss & For Defendant to File a Reply filed by Cave Consulting Group, Inc. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 37 Stipulation re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss . Oppositions/Responses due by 10/9/2015. Replies due by 10/23/2015.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/24/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING re 22 Stipulation Extending Time for Optuminsight to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by OptumInsight, Inc., Signed by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/14/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FINDING CASES NOT RELATED. The court has reviewed the motion (428 in 5:11-cv-00469-EJD) and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/5/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cave Consulting Group, Inc. v. OptumInsight, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cave Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Louis Brophy
Represented By: David W. Harlan
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Zachary C. Howenstine
Represented By: Charles W. Steese
Represented By: Sophie J. Sung
Represented By: Mark Aaron Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumInsight, Inc.,
Represented By: David Allan Couillard
Represented By: Forrest K Tahdooahnippah
Represented By: J. Thomas Vitt
Represented By: Patricia Anne Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?