Grid One Solutions, Inc. v. Elster Amco Water, LLC

Plaintiff: Grid One Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Elster Amco Water, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03452
Filed: July 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/7/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
February 1, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 45 Motion for Administrative Relief to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/1/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 27, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF NON-CONFORMING CHAMBERS COPY re 41 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/27/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
December 16, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 Stipulation re ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 9, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING, IN PART, MOTION TO STRIKE AND INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES. Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/9/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
November 13, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING ON 19 Motion to Dismiss and 20 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 13, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
September 28, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/28/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grid One Solutions, Inc. v. Elster Amco Water, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grid One Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John Andrew Canale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elster Amco Water, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?