Mitchell v. Oracle Racing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Matthew Charles Mitchell
Defendant: Oracle Racing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03455
Filed: July 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/21/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 14, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE 44 MOTION for Sanctions Against Plaintiff and His Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Responses due by 4/18/2016. Replies due by 4/20/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Show Cause Response due by 4/18/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/21/2016 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/14/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
October 27, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2016. Case Management Conference reset for 1/14/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/27/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Oracle Racing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Racing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Charles Mitchell
Represented By: Patricia Maria Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?