Moss v. Infinity Insurance Company, et al

Plaintiff: Arryanne Moss
Defendant: Infinity Insurance Company, AWS Insurance Company, Lithia Chrysler Jeep and Dodge of Santa Rosa
Case Number: 3:2015cv03456
Filed: July 27, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 82 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
December 9, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LIMITED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/9/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
October 6, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Motion Hearings: Case Management Conference, 70 73 Motions Hearing continued from 10/13/2016 to 11/17/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2016. Signed by Judge Jacqueline S. Corley on 10/6/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
August 5, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 62 Motion for Leave to File. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 14, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, signed 7/14/16, by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 40 Infinity's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 31 Lithia's Motion to Dismiss. Amended complaint shall be filed within 30 days of this Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
April 22, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/20/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/22/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
December 7, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVIEWING THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ORDERING SERVICE BY THE MARSHALS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/7/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 20, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVIEWING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/20/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
October 16, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVIEWING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/15/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
September 14, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVIEWING COMPLAINT UNDER SECTION 1915 AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/11/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Infinity Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arryanne Moss
Represented By: Reuben Lagbao Nocos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AWS Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia Chrysler Jeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge of Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?