Freedom of the Press Foundation v. United States Department of Justice

Plaintiff: Freedom of the Press Foundation
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2015cv03503
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. RE ( 30 , 37 ) CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
February 8, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 48 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Neill T. Tseng and Permitting Withdrawal. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/8/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
June 27, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 36 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 3, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 33 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limit. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
May 18, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 STIPULATION OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FREEDOM OF THE PRESS FOUNDATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
January 21, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation Concerning Briefing Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 11, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 21 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the January 19, 2016 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
November 2, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the November 3, 2015 Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
July 31, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom of the Press Foundation v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom of the Press Foundation
Represented By: Diana Victoria Baranetsky
Represented By: Marcia Clare Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?