White v. State of California, et al

Plaintiff: Dejon D White
Defendant: State of California, B. Warren and L.M. Pennisi, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03521
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion for "New Trial". The hearing scheduled for 10/19/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/17/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
April 28, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 47 , 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment will be entered in favor of the State Defendants consistent with this order. All other matters are TERMINATED and VACATED. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/28/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
September 23, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY): Based on the parties Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement, the court has determined an appearance is unnecessary at this time. Accordingly, the Trial Setting Conference is VACATED and NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY the parties a re ordered to comply with the following schedule. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 5/16/2017 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 5/16/2017 01:30 PM, 5/17, 5/19, 5/23, 5/24, 5/26, 5/30 and 5/31/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/23/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
October 19, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ENLARGING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES 7 . Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/19/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. State of California, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dejon D White
Represented By: Darryl Parker
Represented By: Pamela Yvette Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.M. Pennisi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?