Nichols v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Mary Nichols
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, erroneously sued as WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03564
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. The action is dismissed, without further leave to amend. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 27, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; VACATING HEARING. The complaint is dismissed. If plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint, plaintiff shall file her First Amended Complaint no later than November 20, 2015. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 6, 2015, to January 29, 2016, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than January 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 27, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 7, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
September 9, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 31, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER: Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/31/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 28, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Hon. William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/28/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 26, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/26/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Nichols
Represented By: Tiffany Rochelle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE, erroneously sued as WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?