Microsoft Corporation v. A&S Electronics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: A&S Electronics, Inc. and Alan Z. Lin
Case Number: 3:2015cv03570
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MICROSOFTS REQUEST TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES re 127 Discovery Dispute Letter filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/3/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
April 19, 2017 122 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/19/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
October 26, 2016 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING SEPARATE OBJECTIONS DOCUMENT re Dkt. No. 101 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/26/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
September 1, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE:DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/1/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 29, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND FAILURE TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 9/9/2016 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/2/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 10, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART STIPULATIONS TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: granting 61 Stipulation; denying 63 Stipulation. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
April 28, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 49 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
March 7, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting [46 ]Stipulation to Extend Case Deadlines and re 47 Order on Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 47 Order on Stipula tion, 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Case Deadlines. Completion of Private Mediation by 8/15/2016. Non-Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2016. Expert Discovery Cutoff is 10/29/16. 5 Day Bench Trial set for 3/6/2017 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2016. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 8/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Dispositive/Daubert Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4 th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Pretrial Statement filed by 2/3/2017. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2/17/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 1/27/17 at 9:01 AM. Joint Compliance Statement due 1/20/17. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/7/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 17, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING 43 Stipulation filed by A&S Electronics, Inc., Alan Z. Lin, Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/17/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
December 11, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING RE: 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by A&S Electronics, Inc., Alan Z. Lin.Stipulation filed no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, December 14, 2015. Otherwise the hearing will take place as scheduled. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/11/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 18, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/18/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
October 21, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 21 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 22 Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
August 7, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/7/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. A&S Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Bonnie Elizabeth MacNaughton
Represented By: Conner Gene Peretti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&S Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Z. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?