Via Vadis, LLC et al v. Netgear, Inc.
Plaintiff: Via Vadis, LLC and AC Technologies, S.A.
Defendant: Netgear Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv03573
Filed: August 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 64 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/16/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER For Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/2/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/20/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Via Vadis, LLC et al v. Netgear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Via Vadis, LLC
Represented By: Edward M. Buxbaum
Represented By: Andrew G. DiNovo
Represented By: Victor G Hardy
Represented By: William Paul Schuck
Represented By: Steven E. Tiller
Represented By: Robert J. Weltchek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AC Technologies, S.A.
Represented By: Edward M. Buxbaum
Represented By: Andrew G. DiNovo
Represented By: Victor G Hardy
Represented By: William Paul Schuck
Represented By: Steven E. Tiller
Represented By: Robert J. Weltchek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netgear Inc
Represented By: Geoffrey William Heaven
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Represented By: Jose Carlos Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?