Chalfant v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Heather Chalfant
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv03577
Filed: August 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Granting 69 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(A)(1)(A)(II). Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/14/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
September 26, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (denying 62 Stipulation). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
August 31, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 48 MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLAINTIFF; ORDER DENYING 25 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Heather Chalfant terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
April 13, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/19/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/13/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
December 17, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation REGARDING SCHEDULING FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
October 15, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/15/215. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chalfant v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Chalfant
Represented By: Jessica M. Cho
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter John Felsenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?