Natali, Inc. v. Howard et al

Plaintiff: Natali, Inc.
Defendant: Shannon Dawn Howard, Shane Howard, Sean Boyle and Matthew Donham
Case Number: 3:2015cv03589
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL FILING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/22/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 9, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Ex Parte Application re 26 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Shannon Dawn Howard, Shane Howard and Sean Boyle For Order Continuing Hearing Date filed by Natali, Inc. Reset Hearing as to 26 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Shannon Dawn Howard, Shane Howard and Sean Boyle. Motion Hearing reset for 4/8/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/9/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
January 13, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment filed by Natali, Inc. Motions for default judgment due by 2/19/2016.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/13/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natali, Inc. v. Howard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natali, Inc.
Represented By: Ray Khem Shahani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Dawn Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Donham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?