Mueller v. Rite Aid Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Richard Mueller
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv03595
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL (pursuant to 53 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
April 20, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 33 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 4, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
December 18, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR for Court Mediation to be completed by 3/31/16. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2016. Non-Expert Discovery due by 9/2/2016. Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2016 02:00 P M in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 1/9/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 3-5 Day Jury Trial set for 1/9/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Wednesday, 12/21/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon . Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for Wednesday, 11/23/2016 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/18/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
November 10, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL FILING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/10/2015. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mueller v. Rite Aid Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mueller
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Rishi N. Sharma
Represented By: Sophie J. Sung
Represented By: Jeffrey David Wohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?