Pixels.com, LLC v. Instagram, LLC

Plaintiff: Pixels.com, LLC
Defendant: Instagram, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv03610
Filed: August 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE WITHDRAWL OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/3/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
August 28, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 18 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Set Modified Briefing Schedule.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 20, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/20/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pixels.com, LLC v. Instagram, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pixels.com, LLC
Represented By: Amy Sullivan Cahill
Represented By: Matthew Slevin
Represented By: Mari-Elise Taube
Represented By: Vijay K. Toke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?