Pope et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Vicki Pope and Gregory Pope
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv03617
Filed: August 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/30/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
January 13, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/13/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
October 30, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Deadline to Seek Leave to Amend Pleadings: 12/15/2015Cross Motions due by 3/24/2016Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2016 Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/30/2015 (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
August 27, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting request for leave to amend. Plaintiffs shall e-file their First Amended Complaint by 8/28/2015. No chambers copy is required. Defendant's 5 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pope et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Elise Dale Klein
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Ubl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Pope
Represented By: Michael Lee Cohen
Represented By: Heather Michelle Mason McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Pope
Represented By: Michael Lee Cohen
Represented By: Heather Michelle Mason McKeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?