Perry v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al

Plaintiff: Vicky Perry
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., National Default Servicing Corporation and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03629
Filed: August 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
March 16, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STATUS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/16/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
February 11, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/7/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/11/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
November 3, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting 26 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend and Denying 24 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens Without Prejudice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 9, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ADDENDUM TO ORDER DENYING TRO. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/9/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/9/2015 (cl, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/9/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 25, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Perry
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?