Mestayer v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: Gloria A. Mestayer
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 3:2015cv03650
Filed: August 10, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
June 20, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 69 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
February 17, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 42 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
December 23, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 15-03645-EMC. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/23/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
November 30, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 STIPULATION to extend deadlines re 42 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/10/2015. Replies due by 12/17/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/30/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 24, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 16, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/16/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mestayer v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria A. Mestayer
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?