Bornnard v. Greyhound Lines Inc

Plaintiff: Walter E. Bornnard
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03660
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Pretrial Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Pretrial Conference is continued to 9/27/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The first day of the Jury Trial is continued to 11/1/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
April 21, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Case Management Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
November 10, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Jury Trial by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 4/12/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. A Pretrial Conference is set for 8/16/20 16 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Jury Trial shall begin on 9/12/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bornnard v. Greyhound Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter E. Bornnard
Represented By: Steven J. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?