Global Industries, Inc., a Delaware Corporation v. Ergo Contract Furniture, a California Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Global Industries, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Defendant: Ergo Contract Furniture, Euro Space, Inc., John Eric Yocuis, Darren Pitts and Randy Moseley
Case Number: 3:2015cv03666
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of this cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's claims alleged against defendants be dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within thirty (30) days, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 20, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FEBRUARY 3, 2016 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/20/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
December 1, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the Fourth Cause of Action, the motion is granted, and the Fourth Cause of Action is dismissed, with leave to amend no later than December 18, 2015. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
August 25, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Industries, Inc., a Delaware Corporation v. Ergo Contract Furniture, a California Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergo Contract Furniture
Represented By: Kenneth Marc Weinfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Space, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Marc Weinfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Eric Yocuis
Represented By: Kenneth Marc Weinfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Pitts
Represented By: Kenneth Marc Weinfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moseley
Represented By: Kenneth Marc Weinfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Industries, Inc., a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Terrence Matthew Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?