July 10, 2018 |
Filing
157
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 156 to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
|
March 14, 2018 |
Filing
152
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 151 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
|
January 12, 2018 |
Filing
146
STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/12/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
|
November 27, 2017 |
Filing
144
STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
|
August 21, 2017 |
Filing
140
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 139 Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2017. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/30/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/21/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
|
September 7, 2016 |
Filing
106
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference reset for 10/18/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/7/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
|
June 24, 2016 |
Filing
102
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/21/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
|
March 28, 2016 |
Filing
84
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 55 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Denying Without Prejudice 64 Plaintiffs' Motion to Conditionally Certify FLSA Claims. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
|
February 24, 2016 |
Filing
73
STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 72 : The Parties hereby stipulate and agree, through their undersigned counsel, that (1) Plaintiffs claims against Defendants shall be dismissed from the instant lawsuit; (2) Plaintiffs claims against Defendants shall be resolved in arbitration on an individual basis only, and not on a class or collective action basis; (3) Uber shall pay for the arbitrators costs and arbitration-specific fees pertaining to the aforementioned arbitration; (4) each party shall bear hi s or its respective attorneys fees incurred in relation to the instant action and the aforementioned arbitration, except as otherwise provided in any award of attorneys fees made by a judge or arbitrator in this action or the aforementioned arbitration; and (5) this stipulation and dismissal shall not influence the rights or obligations of Plaintiff Ricardo Del Rio. Tony Mehrdad Saghebian terminated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/24/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
57
NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/29/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
53
STIPULATION AND ORDER 52 regarding Defendants' Rule 12 Motion Briefing filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/15/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
|
January 5, 2016 |
Filing
50
ORDER RE CORRECTIVE NOTICE. Responses due by January 6, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
|
December 16, 2015 |
Filing
41
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 16 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
|
October 23, 2015 |
Filing
24
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION BRIEFING filed by Tony Mehrdad Saghebian, Ricardo Del Rio. Responses due by 11/11/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
|
September 14, 2015 |
Filing
12
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 11 Stipulation filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier-CA, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
10
Notice of Reference and Order re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/26/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
|