S&R Welding, Inc. v. Total Team Construction Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: S&R Welding, Inc.
Defendant: Total Team Construction Services, Inc., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Burton & Clark Steel, Inc. and Keith R. Black
Case Number: 3:2015cv03691
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Jury Trial by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Pretrial Conference is set for 4/25/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Jury Trial shall begin on 5/22/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
February 11, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Request for Telephonic Appearance signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 43 Request. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
February 10, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Request for One Day Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 44 Request. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S&R Welding, Inc. v. Total Team Construction Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&R Welding, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Beard Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Team Construction Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton & Clark Steel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith R. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?