Gyorke-Takatri et al v. Nestle USA, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Gyorke-Takatri and Katie Silver
Defendant: Gerber Products Company and Nestle USA, Inc
Case Number: 3:2015cv03702
Filed: August 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING MOTIONS FOR STAY, LEAVE TO SUBMIT ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE, AND TO SHORTEN TIME AS MOOT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 44 Motion to Stay; denying 45 Motion to Shorten Time (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 6, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Remand; granting 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Exhibit A to the Levitan Declaration is ORDERED SEALED. The hearing set for November 17, 2015 is hereby VACATED. This action is hereby REMANDED to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Francisco. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
September 11, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO RELATE CASE. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 9/11/2015. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 31, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/31/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 27, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/27/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gyorke-Takatri et al v. Nestle USA, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Products Company
Represented By: Rachel J Feldman
Represented By: Bryan Alexander Merryman
Represented By: Arash V Sadat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Gyorke-Takatri
Represented By: Stephen Henry Gardner
Represented By: Amanda Marie Howell
Represented By: John Roddy
Represented By: Elizabeth Ryan
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Zevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Silver
Represented By: Stephen Henry Gardner
Represented By: Amanda Marie Howell
Represented By: John Roddy
Represented By: Elizabeth Ryan
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Zevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?