Romo et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Chris Romo and Maria Dulia Romo
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2015cv03708
Filed: August 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 85 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Chris Romo. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/30/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
January 10, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Discovery Dates filed by Chris Romo. Discovery due by 2/26/2017. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
November 16, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
August 23, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2016. Initial Case Management Conference reset from 8/26/2016 to 9/1/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/23/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 12, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/12/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
June 28, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 29 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 6, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 31, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Chris Romo filed by Chris Romo. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
March 29, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Revision of Briefing Schedule filed by Chris Romo. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/29/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
January 27, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 22, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2016. Case Management Conference reset from 1/28/2016 to 3/3/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
December 3, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: December 17, 2015 hearing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romo et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Romo
Represented By: Nelson W. Goodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Dulia Romo
Represented By: Nelson W. Goodell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Viddell Lee Heard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?