Les Fields/C.C.H.I. Insurance Services v. Hines et al.,

Plaintiff: Les Fields/C.C.H.I. Insurance Services
Defendant: Stuart M Hines, Deborah Canadas, Risk Management and Reinsurance Services, Inc., Interremedy Insurance Services, LLC, Joyce McGuire and Kim Willoughby
Case Number: 3:2015cv03728
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2017 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/3/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
June 6, 2017 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James terminating 111 Motion in Limine; terminating 119 Motion in Limine. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
May 10, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 106 Motion in Limine; Ordering Plaintiff's Counsel to file Declaration no later than 5/15/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
November 28, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Sanctions [re 79 Order]. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/28/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 22, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 59 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2017. Plaintiff's renewed Dispositive Motion due by 12/15/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
September 26, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/3/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/26/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
June 9, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE AND REFERRING PARTIES TO JUDGE BEELER FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/9/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 19, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 42 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/19/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
January 5, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 29 Clapp Moroney's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Risk Management and Reinsurance Services, Inc. only. Clapp Moroney continues to represent Stuart Hines. Should Risk be reinstated, it is advised that it may not appear pro se or through its corporate officers, but must retain new counsel forthwith to represent it in this lawsuit. See Civ. L.R. 3-9(b). (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
November 6, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER:Case referred to another magistrate judge for a settlement conference Deadline to Seek Leave to Amend Pleadings: 2/1/2016 Discovery due by 4/26/2016Dispositive Motions due by 5/26/2016Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 Jury Trial set for 11/14/2016 Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/6/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Les Fields/C.C.H.I. Insurance Services v. Hines et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Fields/C.C.H.I. Insurance Services
Represented By: Bernard Paul Kenneally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart M Hines
Represented By: James G. Lucier
Represented By: Paul Shryung Sheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Canadas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Management and Reinsurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: James G. Lucier
Represented By: Paul Shryung Sheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interremedy Insurance Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Willoughby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?