In re Facebook Biometric Information Privacy Litigation
Plaintiff: Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen and Carlo Licata
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Respondent: Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
Interested Party: Frederick William Gullen, Clayton P. Zellmer and Scott Schinder
Not Classified By Court: Dawn Frankfother, Cathy Flanagan and Kara Ross
Case Number: 3:2015cv03747
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 585 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Michael E. Rayfield as Counsel for Defendant (Rayfield, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2022)
November 1, 2022 Filing 584 NOTICE of Second Post-Distribution Accounting by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Updated Supplemental Declaration of Lana Lucchesi Re: Distribution of Settlement Funds) (Davidson, Stuart) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 583 Order by Judge James Donato granting #579 Administrative Motion for Order Releasing Attorneys' Fees. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
July 25, 2022 Filing 582 RESPONSE re #580 Letter from Larry Albrecht by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER. Class counsel are requested to address the letter received from the class member, Dkt. No. 580. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/22/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 21, 2022 Filing 580 Letter dated 7/11/2022 from Larry Albrecht. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2022)
July 11, 2022 Filing 579 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER RELEASING REMAINDER OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AWARDED TO CLASS COUNSEL filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. Responses due by 7/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart A. Davidson, #2 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Stuart) (Filed on 7/11/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 578 NOTICE by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen Plaintiffs' Post-Distribution Accounting (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lana Lucchesi)(Davidson, Stuart) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Order by Judge James Donato granting #575 Stipulation re Costs on Appeal and Objectors' Attorneys' Fees. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 576 MANDATE of USCA as to #542 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 11, 2022 Filing 575 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding costs on appeal and objectors' attorneys' fees filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER of USCA as to #542 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2022)
March 31, 2022 Filing 573 BILL OF COSTS by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. Objections due by 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Itemization of Costs on Appeal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 3/31/2022)
March 17, 2022 Filing 572 USCA Memorandum as to #542 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 15, 2022 Filing 571 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael P. Canty for Ross M. Kamhi (Canty, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 15, 2022 Filing 570 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael P. Canty for Mark R. Winston (Canty, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 15, 2022 Filing 569 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael P. Canty for Joel H. Bernstein (Canty, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 15, 2022 Filing 568 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael P. Canty for Corban S. Rhodes (Canty, Michael) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER. The #551 motion for appeal bonds and #561 motion for correction of settlement website are denied for lack of good cause. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/10/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
November 1, 2021 Filing 566 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Shawn A. Williams (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 565 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Corban S Rhodes for Lawrence A. Sucharow (Rhodes, Corban) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 564 OBJECTIONS to re #563 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 563 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Attorneys Fees (Pentz, John) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 2, 2021 Filing 562 Response re #561 MOTION to Compel the Parties to Correct the Settlement Website byCarlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Tievsky)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 8/2/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 561 MOTION to Compel the Parties to Correct the Settlement Website filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 8/2/2021. Replies due by 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec in Support)(Pentz, John) (Filed on 7/19/2021) Modified on 7/21/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER of USCA as to #542 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit No. 21-15553, filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER of USCA as to #544 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Kara Ross. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 558 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #551 MOTION For Appeal Bonds ) filed byKara Ross. (Camarena, Paul) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 557 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #551 MOTION For Appeal Bonds ) filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1 to JJP Dec)(Pentz, John) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 556 Supplemental Brief in Support re #551 MOTION For Appeal Bonds filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 555 ) (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 6/1/2021) Modified on 6/2/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER re #551 Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bonds. Rule 7 of the Fed. R. App. P. permits the district court to "require an appellant to file a bond or provide other security in any form and amount necessary to ensure payment of costs on appeal." Plaintiffs have not explained why $5,000 against Objectors Frankfother and Flanagan, and $5,000 against Objector Ross, are reasonable estimates of the costs that are likely to be "properly awardable" against them "at the conclusion of the appeal." Azizian v. Federated Dept. Stores, Inc., 499 F.3d 950, 958 (9th Cir. 2007). Plaintiffs simply state that "is the appropriate amount" without providing any kind of breakdown or supporting explanation. Dkt. No. 551 at 3. Consequently, the Court calls for a supplemental submission from plaintiffs by June 1, 2021, addressing that point only. Objectors may respond by June 8, 2021, again limited to the sole issue of the reasonableness of plaintiffs' estimates of what the appeal bond amounts should be. The hearing that was set for May 27, 2021, is vacated pending further order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/24/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 554 REPLY (re #551 MOTION For Appeal Bonds ) filed byCarlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paul J. Geller, #2 Exhibit B - H1B LCA Details for LOYOLA UNIVERSITY CHICAGO with Case Number I-200-20086-438347)(Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 5, 2021 Filing 553 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #551 MOTION For Appeal Bonds ) filed byKara Ross. (Camarena, Paul) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 1, 2021 Filing 552 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #551 MOTION For Appeal Bonds ) Objectors' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bonds filed byCathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kendrick Jan ISO Opposition to Plaintiffs' Bond Motion, #2 Exhibit IL Lobbyist Registration Act, #3 Exhibit Edelson PC_IL SOS Lobbyist Registration Records, #4 Exhibit GNG_IL SOS Lobbyist Registration Records, #5 Exhibit Elking Consulting_IL SOS Lobbyist Registration Records, #6 Exhibit JMDPS_IL SOS Lobbyist Registration Records, #7 Exhibit Digital Privacy Alliance_LinkedIn, #8 Exhibit Luther Federal Registration_comparison purposes)(Jan, Kendrick) (Filed on 5/1/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 551 MOTION For Appeal Bonds filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/5/2021. Replies due by 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER. The hearing on the #538 motion for attorney's fees is re-set for September 9, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/12/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 12, 2021 Filing 549 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/12/2021. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 2, 2021 Filing 548 REPLY (re #538 MOTION for Attorney's Fees ) Reply of Objectors Frankfother and Flanagan to Plaintiffs' Response to Objectors' Motion for Attorney's Fees filed byCathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (Jan, Kendrick) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 547 USCA Case Number 21-15555 for #544 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Kara Ross. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 546 USCA Case Number 21-15553 for #542 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2021)
March 30, 2021 Filing 545 STIPULATION to Entry of Final Judgment filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment) (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 3/30/2021) Modified on 3/30/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2021 Filing 544 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kara Ross. 21-15555 (Appeal fee of $505.00, receipt number 0971-15763962 paid.) (Camarena, Paul) (Filed on 3/29/2021) Modified on 3/30/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2021 Filing 543 Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Facebook Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 3/29/2021) Modified on 3/30/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2021 Filing 542 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. Appeal of Order, Terminate Motions #537 21-15553 (Appeal fee of $505.00, receipt number 0971-15760715 paid.) (Pentz, John) (Filed on 3/27/2021) Modified on 3/30/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2021 Filing 541 Response re #538 MOTION for Attorney's Fees byCarlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 24, 2021 Filing 540 NOTICE of Filing in Accordance with Dkt. 539 by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen re 539 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement, #2 Exhibit 2 Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 3/24/2021) Modified on 3/25/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER. The motions to seal, Dkt. Nos. 444, 446, 461, 464, are resolved as follows. The sealing request in Dkt. No. 444 is denied. Whether evaluated under a compelling reason or good cause standard, see Ctr. for Auto Safety v. Chrysler Grp., LLC, 809 F.3d 1092, 1098 (9th Cir. 2016), Kamakana v. City & Cty. of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172, 1179-80 (9th Cir. 2006), the proposed redactions of the brief in support of preliminary approval, Dkt. No. 445, are unwarranted. The sealing request in Dkt. No. 446 is granted because the redactions relate to trade secrets and sensitive commercial information. The sealing request in Dkt. No. 461 is denied as unwarranted under either standard. The sealing request in Dkt. No. 464 is denied for the same reasons. The parties should file the underlying documents in a manner consistent with this order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/22/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 538 MOTION for Attorney's Fees filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/26/2021. Replies due by 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of John J. Pentz ISO Objectors Motion for Attorney Fees, #2 Declaration Declaration of Kendrick Jan ISO Objectors Motion for Attorney Fees, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order_grant of fee motion, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service_03122021)(Jan, Kendrick) (Filed on 3/12/2021) Modified on 3/15/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER RE FINAL APPROVAL, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/26/2021. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 536 NOTICE by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 535 [Proposed] Order GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF AMENDED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT re 534 Order filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Davidson, Stuart) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER. Plaintiffs are directed to file by February 1, 2021, a proposed final approval order, with an electronic version emailed to jdpo@cand.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/27/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 533 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/14/2021 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 18, 2021 Filing 532 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 14, 2021, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #529 Transcript Order, #531 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2021. (Related documents(s) #529 , #531 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 531 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/14/2021 before Judge James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 530 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2021. Total Time in Court: 1:40. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 529 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/14/2021 before Judge James Donato by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Geller, Paul) (Filed on 1/15/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 528 ERRATA Re Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Awards & Amended Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #526 Motion for Reconsideration as to Paul Camarena. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 526 MOTION for Reconsideration of application to appear pro hace vice filed by Kara Ross. (Camarena, Paul) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 525 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Camarena for objector Kara Ross as to local counsel Amie Miller (Camarena, Paul) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying #522 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Paul Camarena. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #505 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John J. Pentz. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 522 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15411646.) filed by Kara Ross. (Camarena, Paul) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 521 REPLY (re #517 Amended MOTION Final Approval of a Class Action Settlement re #474 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 515 Order,, Terminate Motions, ) Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Filing of Objectors Frankfother and Flanagan (Dkt. 518) filed byCarlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER. In light of a preliminary injunction matter, the final approval hearing in this case is continued to January 14, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. The hearing will be held by Zoom webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by January 12, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/4/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 21, 2020 Filing 519 OBJECTION by Kara Ross. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Letter) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 17, 2020 Filing 518 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #517 Amended MOTION Final Approval of a Class Action Settlement re #474 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 515 Order,, Terminate Motions, ) Objectors' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byCathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (Jan, Kendrick) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 14, 2020 Filing 517 Amended MOTION Final Approval of a Class Action Settlement re #474 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 515 Order,, Terminate Motions, filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/28/2020. Replies due by 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lucchesi Declaration, #2 Exhibit Second Rubenstein Declaration)(Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER. The request to take depositions and written discovery from the objectors to final settlement approval, Dkt. No. 507, is denied. The evidence in the record is sufficient for the Court to resolve the objections without discovery. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/14/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER. Plaintiffs' #510 request for leave to file a 33-page motion is denied. Plaintiffs are directed to re-file a motion of 25 pages or less by December 14, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/8/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 7, 2020 Filing 514 REPLY (re #507 MOTION for Discovery (leave to issue subpoenas to Dawn Frankfother and Cathy Flanagan) ) filed byCarlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
December 4, 2020 Filing 513 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #507 MOTION for Discovery (leave to issue subpoenas to Dawn Frankfother and Cathy Flanagan) ) Objectors' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Issue Subpoenas to Dawn Frankfother and Cathy Flanagan filed byCathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Discovery Motion_Kendrick Jan, #2 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Discovery Motion_John Pentz, #3 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Discovery Motion_Dawn Frankfother, #4 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Discovery Motion_Cathy Flanagan, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order_Motion Denied)(Jan, Kendrick) (Filed on 12/4/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 512 Declaration of Jake Webb in Support of #511 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement re #510 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) #511 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 511 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement re #510 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/17/2020. Replies due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lucchesi Declaration, #2 Exhibit Second Rubenstein Declaration)(Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 12/3/2020)
December 3, 2020 Filing 510 UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of the Page Limit filed by Carlo Licata. (Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 12/3/2020) Modified on 12/7/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Order by Judge James Donato granting #508 Motion to Shorten Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Issue Subpoenas. Objectors Flanagan and Frankfother are directed to respond to the motion for leave to issue subpoenas, Dkt. No. 507, by December 4, 2020. Any reply must be filed by December 7, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 508 MOTION to Shorten Time for briefing on motion for leave to issue subpoenas filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander G. Tievsky, #2 Proposed Order)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 507 MOTION for Discovery (leave to issue subpoenas to Dawn Frankfother and Cathy Flanagan) filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/14/2020. Replies due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 25, 2020 Filing 506 Seventh Joint Report Regarding Progress of Notice filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Geller, Paul) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 21, 2020 Filing 505 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15225223.) filed by Cathy Flanagan, Dawn Frankfother. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate Good Standing)(Pentz, John) (Filed on 11/21/2020)
November 20, 2020 Filing 504 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, and Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expense, and Incentive Awards by Dawn Frankfother, Cathy Flanagan. (Jan, Kendrick) (Filed on 11/20/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 503 Sixth Joint Report Regarding Progress of Notice by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Geller, Paul) (Filed on 11/11/2020) Modified on 11/12/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2020 Filing 501 FIFTH JOINT REPORT regarding progress of notice by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 10/28/2020) Modified on 10/29/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 500 Order by Judge James Donato granting #498 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs' unopposed request for excess pages for their attorneys' fees and incentive awards motion is granted. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 502 Letter from Antoinette Lumpkin, dated 9/26/2020 re class action settlement. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 499 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Carlo Licata. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/29/2020. Replies due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Class Counsel Dec, #2 Exhibit Fitzpatrick Declaration, #3 Exhibit Rubenstein Declaration, #4 Exhibit RGRD Declaration, #5 Exhibit Labaton Declaration, #6 Exhibit Edelson Declaration, #7 Exhibit Licata Declaration, #8 Exhibit Patel Declaration, #9 Exhibit Pezen Declaration)(Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 498 Unopposed Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of the Page Limit filed by Carlo Licata. (Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 10/15/2020) Modified on 10/20/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2020 Filing 496 Fourth Joint Report Regarding Progress of Notice by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Geller, Paul) (Filed on 10/14/2020) Modified on 10/15/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2020 Filing 495 Declaration of Gregory M. Nespole in Support of #493 Notice (Other) filed by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP. (Related document(s) #493 ) (Nespole, Gregory) (Filed on 10/14/2020) Modified on 10/15/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2020 Filing 497 OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement Agreement submitted by Kevin C. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER re #493 Proposed Curative Notice by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/8/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 493 NOTICE of Proposed Curative by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PROPOSED CURATIVE NOTICE BY LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP)(Nespole, Gregory) (Filed on 10/6/2020) Modified on 10/8/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2020 Filing 492 THIRD JOINT REPORT Regarding Progress of Notice by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2020) Modified on 10/5/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2020 Filing 491 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: MOTION TO RELATE CASES (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 490 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/04/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 489 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/23/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 488 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/22/2020 before Judge James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 487 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/22/2020, before Judge Donato. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #485 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/14/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2020. (Related documents(s) #485 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 486 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2020. Total Time in Court: 19 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Hebel. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 485 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/22/2020 before Judge James Donato by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Order by Judge James Donato granting #482 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Gregory Nespole.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 483 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to TRO filed by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Declaration)(Apton, Adam) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 482 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14966404.) filed by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP. (Nespole, Gregory) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER re #477 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as to Levi & Korsinsky LLP. The Court sets a hearing on this motion for September 22, 2020, at 11 a.m., by Zoom webinar. Class Counsel and Levi & Korsinsky should each designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by September 22, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: #https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/21/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 480 REPLY (re #477 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to LEVI & KORSINSKY LLP ) filed byCarlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Geller, Paul) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 18, 2020 Filing 479 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #477 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Levi & Korsinsky LLP) filed byLevi & Korsinsky, LLP. (Apton, Adam) (Filed on 9/18/2020) Modified on 9/21/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 478 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Facebook Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2020) Modified on 9/21/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 477 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Levi & Korsinsky LLP filed by Carlo Licata, Nimesh Patel, Adam Pezen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L Dore, #2 Exhibit 1 to Dore Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Dore Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Dore Declaration, #5 Proposed Order granting TRO)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 9/18/2020) Modified on 9/21/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2020 Filing 476 SECOND JOINT REPORT Regarding Progress on Notice by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Geller, Paul) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2020 Filing 475 First Joint Report Regarding Progress of Notice by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Geller, Paul) (Filed on 9/2/2020) Modified on 9/3/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/19/2020. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 473 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/23/2020 before Judge James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 471 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/23/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 470 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/23/20, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #469 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2020. (Related documents(s) #469 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 469 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/23/2020 before Judge James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Geller, Paul) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 472 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2020. Total Time in Court: 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 468 STIPULATION re 466 Order, Notice of Amended Stipulation of Class Action Settlement filed by Facebook Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER. The hearing set for July 23, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by July 21, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666 PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/17/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER. The parties are free to work with the mediator at their convenience. The hearing set for July 23, 2020, will proceed as scheduled. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 465 Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Excerpts from Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit Excerpt from Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit Elking Declaration)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 464 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 unredacted supplemental brief, #2 redacted supplemental brief)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 463 Declaration of Gary McCoy in Support of #462 Supplemental Brief,,,, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to McCoy Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to McCoy Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to McCoy Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to McCoy Declaration)(Related document(s) #462 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 462 Supplemental Brief re #461 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal REDACTED version of Facebooks Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of the Settlement filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian, #2 Exhibit 1 to Somvichian Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Somvichian Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Somvichian Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Somvichian Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Somvichian Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Somvichian Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Somvichian Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to Somvichian Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 to Somvichian Decl., #11 Exhibit 10 to Somvichian Decl., #12 Exhibit 11 to Somvichian Decl., #13 Exhibit 12 to Somvichian Decl., #14 Exhibit 13 to Somvichian Decl., #15 Exhibit 14 to Somvichian Decl., #16 Exhibit 15 to Somvichian Decl., #17 Exhibit 16 to Somvichian Decl., #18 Exhibit 17 to Somvichian Decl., #19 Exhibit 18 to Somvichian Decl., #20 Exhibit 19 to Somvichian Decl.)(Related document(s) #461 ) (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 461 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 REDACTED version of Facebooks Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of the Settlement, #3 UNREDACTED version of Facebooks Second Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of the Settlement)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 460 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-4-2020, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #457 Transcript Order, #454 Transcript Order, #451 Transcript Order, #453 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2020. (Related documents(s) #457 , #454 , #451 , #453 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER. At the parties' #458 joint request, supplemental briefing and evidence in support of the motion for preliminary approval is due by July 9, 2020. A further hearing, including a presentation of live testimony from Facebook, is set for July 23, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/12/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 458 STIPULATION re #456 Motion Hearing, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Terminate Motions, Order on Motion for Settlement Stipulated Request in Response to the Courts Minute Order (Doc. 456) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 457 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/04/2020 before Judge James Donato by Scott Schinder, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 455 Refund Status re #452 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 454 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/04/2020 before Judge James Donato by Frederick William Gullen, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Milian, David) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 453 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/04/2020 before Judge James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 452 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 26P4KLPC. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 456 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2020. Total Time in Court: 50 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 451 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/4/2020 before Judge James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER. To accommodate a pretrial conference, the Court is rescheduling the hearing, Dkt. No. #445 , to 3:00 p.m. California time. The motion hearing will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name and email address of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at # jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by June 2, 2020, at 4:00 p.m., Cali fornia time. The email addresses for counsel are needed for the appropriate Zoom link, which Ms. Clark will circulate by email prior to the conference. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. Other attorneys on the case who will not be speaking, and members of the press and public, may view the webinar as attendees at the following link: #https://us02web.zoom.us/j/89587223659?pwd=WWxTQ0w2SHRHdnlJWkltQlNiTE1zdz09 Webinar ID: 895 8722 3659 Password: 717717 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +19292056099,,89587223659# or +12532158782,,89587223659# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833International numbers available: # https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kbppL8svAu PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recordi ng, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including screen-shots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/28/2020. (This i s a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 449 Administrative Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference and Associated Deadlines Following General Order 72-3 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael G. Rhodes, #2 Proposed Order)(Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2020 Filing 448 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing >, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #445 Motion for Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)>/I (Related documents(s) #445 )(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 447 Supplemental Brief re #446 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal REDACTED version of Facebooks Supplemental Brief in Support of Preliminary Approval of the Settlement filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian, #2 Exhibit REDACTED Ex. 1 to Somvichian Decl.)(Related document(s) #446 ) (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 446 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Whitty Somvichian, #2 Exhibit REDACTED Ex. 1 to Somvichian Decl., #3 Exhibit UNREDACTED Ex. 1 to Somvichian Decl., #4 REDACTED Supplemental brief ISO settlement, #5 UNREDACTED Supplemental brief ISO settlement, #6 Proposed Order)(Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 445 Motion for Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/4/2020. Replies due by 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jay Edelson, #2 Exhibit Stipulation of Class Action Settlement, #3 Exhibit Excerpts from Hearing of May 21, 2018, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey L. Bleich, #5 Proposed Order)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 5/8/2020) Modified on 5/11/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2020 Filing 444 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement, #2 Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 443 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 5/8/2020) Modified on 5/11/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2020 Filing 442 STATUS REPORT by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 441 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/6/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, the deadline for filing a motion for preliminary class settlement approval is extended to April 17, 2020. The Court sets a jury trial to start on July 13, 2020 at 9:00 a.m., and a pretrial conference on June 25, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. The parties should treat these dates as firm if preliminary approval is not granted. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/13/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 439 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/11/2020) Modified on 3/11/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2020 Filing 438 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/06/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 437 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/06/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 436 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/6/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 434 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/6/2020 before Judge James Donato for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 433 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/6/2020 before Judge James Donato by Clayton P. Zellmer, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Chang, Albert) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 432 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/06/2020 before Judge James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 431 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/06/2020 before Judge James Donato by Scott Schinder, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 430 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/6/20, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #428 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/7/2020. (Related documents(s) #428 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 435 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 2/6/2020.Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance of Jeffrey M. Gutkin as Counsel for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Jeffrey Gutkin (Gutkin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2020 Filing 428 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/06/2020 before Judge James Donato by Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 427 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Facebook Inc.. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 2/3/2020) Modified on 2/3/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2020 Filing 426 U.S. Supreme Court Notice that the petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 425 MANDATE of USCA as to #407 USCA Appeal Number 18-15982. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitty Somvichian for Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER. The Court sets a status and trial setting conference for February 6, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/22/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 421 U.S. Supreme Court Notice. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
November 13, 2019 Filing 420 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes Notice of Appearance of Michael G. Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER of USCA as to #407 Appeal Remark (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER of USCA as to #407 (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER of USCA as to #407 Appeal (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 416 USCA Opinion re appeal No. 18-15982-AFFIRMED. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER of USCA (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER of USCA as to #407 Appeal (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER of USCA (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER of USCA (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 411 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-21-2018, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #388 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2018. (Related documents(s) #388 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 410 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 10/27/2016; 11/30/2017; 03/29/2018; 05/21/2018 before Judge James Donato, re #406 USCA Order Transcript due by 6/28/2018. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 408 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Further Settlement Conference set for 6/15/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu has been VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 409 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 34611134095 re #407 Appeal Remark (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 4, 2018 Filing 407 USCA Appeal Number 18-15982 (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER of USCA as to #361 Appeal (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER. In light of the circuit court's order, all remaining pre-trial and trial dates are vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/29/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER re #364 Request for Stay. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/29/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #399 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Richard E. Nowak. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER RE PRE-TRIAL CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Revisions)(jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 401 Declaration of Denise Moreno in Support of #382 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) #382 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 400 CLERK'S NOTICE DECLINING VIDEO RECORDING. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 399 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12377338.) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Nowak, Richard) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 398 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 397 MOTION to Strike and/or Quash filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/5/2018. Replies due by 6/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit 1 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to John Nadolenco Declaration, #14 Declaration of Mark Zuckerberg, #15 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 396 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 395 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of #393 Declaration in Support, the Parties' Joint Submission of Revised [Proposed] Short-Form Class Notice filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #393 ) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 394 REPLY (re #364 MOTION to Stay ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 393 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of #390 Motion Hearing the Parties' Joint Submission of [Proposed] Class Notices filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #390 ) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER. Pretrial Conference continued to 6/21/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Motion Hearing on #301 , #303 , #305 continued to 6/21/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/21/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 390 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2018. Total Time in Court: 1:04. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 389 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/21/2018 before Judge James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 388 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 21, 2018 before Judge James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 387 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #364 MOTION to Stay ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 20, 2018 Filing 386 REPLY (re #370 MOTION for Approval of Class Notice Plan and for an Order Compelling Defendant to Cooperate in Class Notice ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/20/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 385 DECLARATION of Louis Boval in Opposition to #382 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) #382 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 384 DECLARATION of Aaron Mayerson in Opposition to #382 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) #382 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 383 DECLARATION of John Nadolenco in Opposition to #382 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) #382 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 382 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #370 MOTION for Approval of Class Notice Plan and for an Order Compelling Defendant to Cooperate in Class Notice ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 381 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of #370 MOTION for Approval of Class Notice Plan and for an Order Compelling Defendant to Cooperate in Class Notice filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #370 ) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 380 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi D. Bandman (Bandman, Randi) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Deposition filed by Carlo Licata. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of ECF 341-23, #4 Unredacted Version of ECF 341-23)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER. The Court participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65. The parties are directed to advise the Court by May 22, 2018, if they object to the video recording and online publishing of the jury trial. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 377 EXHIBITS re #376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Omnibus) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Facebook Motion for Summary Judgment REDACTED, #2 Facebook Motion for Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #3 Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment REDACTED, #4 Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #5 Facebook Reply ISO Motion For Summary Judgment REDACTED, #6 Facebook Reply ISO Motion For Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #7 Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment REDACTED, #8 Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #9 Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment REDACTED, #10 Facebooks Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #11 Plaintiffs Reply ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment REDACTED, #12 Plaintiffs Reply ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #13 Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Matthew Turk REDACTED, #14 Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Matthew Turk UNREDACTED, #15 Facebook Opposition Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Matthew Turk REDACTED, #16 Facebook Opposition Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Matthew Turk UNREDACTED, #17 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #376 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Omnibus) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit 14 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Taigman REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 14 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Taigman UNREDACTED, #4 Exhibit 15 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Hashmi REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 15 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Hashmi UNREDACTED, #6 Exhibit 28 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Turk REDACTED, #7 Exhibit 28 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Turk UNREDACTED, #8 Exhibit 33 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Yadan REDACTED, #9 Exhibit 33 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Yadan UNREDACTED, #10 Exhibit 34 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Dunn REDACTED, #11 Exhibit 34 to the Williams Decl ISO Opposition to MSJ Dunn UNREDACTED, #12 Exhibit 9 to the Williams Decl ISO Partial MSJ Turk REDACTED, #13 Exhibit 9 to the Williams Decl ISO Partial MSJ Turk UNREDACTED, #14 Exhibit 21 to the Williams Decl ISO Partial MSJ Taigman REDACTED, #15 Exhibit 21 to the Williams Decl ISO Partial MSJ Taigman UNREDACTED, #16 Exhibit 35 to the Williams Decl ISO Reply ISO MSJ Yadan REDACTED, #17 Exhibit 35 to the Williams Decl ISO Reply ISO MSJ Yadan UNREDACTED, #18 Exhibit 37 to the Williams MSJ Reply Decl Barak PUBLIC, #19 Exhibit 14 to the Williams Decl ISO re Turk Reply Hashmi REDACTED, #20 Exhibit 14 to the Williams Decl ISO re Turk Reply Hashmi UNREDACTED, #21 Exhibit 15 to the Williams Decl ISO re Turk Reply. Dunn REDACTED, #22 Exhibit 15 to the Williams Decl ISO re Turk Reply. Dunn UNREDACTED)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Anne Gusikoff-Stewart (Gusikoff-Stewart, Ellen) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER. Facebook's opposition to plaintiffs' motion for approval of class notice, #370 , is due by 5/18/2018 at 5:00 PM California time. The hearing on the motion is set for 5/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/14/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER. The motion to consolidate cases filed by Clayton P. Zellmer, Dkt. No. #331 , is denied. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/14/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER re Summary Judgment Motions ( #257 , #299 , #307 ). Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/14/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 371 MOTION to Shorten Time Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-3 filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Stuart) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 370 MOTION for Approval of Class Notice Plan and for an Order Compelling Defendant to Cooperate in Class Notice filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/25/2018. Replies due by 6/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Stuart) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 369 REPLY (re #331 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byClayton P. Zellmer. (Chang, Albert) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 368 Statement of Non-Opposition re #365 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #331 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byClayton P. Zellmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #365 ) (Chang, Albert) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 367 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Coughlin (Coughlin, Patrick) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas F. Olts (Olts, Lucas) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 365 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #331 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Clayton P. Zellmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chang, Albert) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 364 MOTION to Stay filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 5/21/2018. Replies due by 5/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 363 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration - Redacted, #2 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration - Unredacted)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 362 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Settlement Conference held on 5/4/2018. Matter did not settle. Further settlement conference scheduled for 6/15/2018 10:00 AM. Judge Ryu will check in with counsel in early June. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 361 USCA Case number 18-80053 (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER. The Court finds the motions for summary judgment, Dkt. Nos. #257 , #299 , #307 , to be suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for May 3, 2018 is vacated, and the Court will issue a decision on the papers. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/1/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 359 REPLY (re #307 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 31 FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 32 FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 34 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 35 FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 36 FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 37 FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 38, #10 Exhibit 39, #11 Exhibit 40, #12 Exhibit 41, #13 Exhibit 42 FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 43 FILED UNDER SEAL, #15 Exhibit 44, #16 Exhibit 45, #17 Exhibit 46, #18 Exhibit 47 FILED UNDER SEAL, #19 Exhibit 48, #20 Exhibit 49 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment REDACTED, #2 Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit 31 FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 32 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 33, #7 Exhibit 34 FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 35 FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 36 FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 37 FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 38, #12 Exhibit 39, #13 Exhibit 40, #14 Exhibit 41, #15 Exhibit 42 FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit 43 FILED UNDER SEAL, #17 Exhibit 44, #18 Exhibit 45, #19 Exhibit 46, #20 Exhibit 47 FILED UNDER SEAL, #21 Exhibit 48, #22 Exhibit 49 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 357 REPLY (re #301 MOTION in Limine ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Proposed Expert Matthew Turk, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit 12 FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 13 FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 14 FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 15 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 16 FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 17 FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 18 FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 19 FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 20 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants Proposed Expert Matthew Turk, Ph.D. REDACTED, #2 Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Proposed Expert Matthew Turk, Ph.D. FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Proposed Expert Matthew Turk, Ph.D., #4 Exhibit 12 FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 13 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 14 FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 15 FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 16 FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 17 FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 18 FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 19 FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 20 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 355 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #331 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 354 REPLY (re #305 MOTION to Strike or Exclude Dunn Report ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco (Supplemental), #2 Exhibit 11 to Nadolenco Declaration)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 353 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 to Nadolenco Declaration, #2 Reply ISO Motion to Strike or Exclude Dunn Report REDACTED, #3 Reply ISO Motion to Strike or Exclude Dunn Report UNREDACTED)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 352 REPLY (re #303 MOTION to Strike Motion to Exclude Hashmi Report, Opinions, and Testimony ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco (Supplemental), #2 Exhibit 14 to Nadolenco Declaration, #3 Exhibit 15 to Nadolenco Declaration, #4 Exhibit 16 to Nadolenco Declaration)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 351 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 to Nadolenco Declaration, #2 Exhibit 16 to Nadolenco Declaration, #3 Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Hashmi Report, Opinions, and Testimony REDACTED, #4 Reply ISO Motion to Exclude Hashmi Report, Opinions, and Testimony UNREDACTED)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 350 REPLY (re #299 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 349 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply ISO MSJ REDACTED, #2 Reply ISO MSJ UNREDACTED)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 348 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #331 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Canty, Michael) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER. At the May 3, 2018 hearing, the Court will take up all the summary judgment motions. Dkt. Nos. #257 , #299 , #307 . The Court will hear argument on the motion in limine (Dkt. No. #301 ) and motions to strike (Dkt. Nos. #303 , #305 ) at the June 14, 2018 pretrial conference. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/26/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 17, 2018 Filing 346 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Planning call held on 4/17/2018 in advance of 5/4/2018 settlement conference. Mr. Licata may attend telephonically, but must be available throughout the entire settlement conference. FTR Time: Not Recorded. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/17/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 345 DECLARATION of Corban S. Rhodes in Opposition to #303 MOTION to Strike Motion to Exclude Hashmi Report, Opinions, and Testimony, #305 MOTION to Strike or Exclude Dunn Report filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #303 , #305 ) (Rhodes, Corban) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 344 EXHIBITS re #340 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit UNREDACTED Exhibit 2 & 8, #2 UNREDACTED Exhibit 9, #3 UNREDACTED Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #340 ) (Rhodes, Corban) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 343 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #305 MOTION to Strike or Exclude Dunn Report ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Canty, Michael) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 342 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #303 MOTION to Strike Motion to Exclude Hashmi Report, Opinions, and Testimony ) filed byADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, and Carlo Licata. (Canty, Michael) (Filed on 4/16/2018) Modified on 4/19/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2018 Filing 341 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #307 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment REDACTED filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1 FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 2 FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 3 FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14 FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit 15 FILED UNDER SEAL, #17 Exhibit 16 FILED UNDER SEAL, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18 FILED UNDER SEAL, #20 Exhibit 19 FILED UNDER SEAL, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21 FILED UNDER SEAL, #23 Exhibit 22 FILED UNDER SEAL, #24 Exhibit 23 FILED UNDER SEAL, #25 Exhibit 24 FILED UNDER SEAL, #26 Exhibit 25 FILED UNDER SEAL, #27 Exhibit 26 FILED UNDER SEAL, #28 Exhibit 27 FILED UNDER SEAL, #29 Exhibit 28 FILED UNDER SEAL, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30 FILED UNDER SEAL, #32 Exhibit 31 FILED UNDER SEAL, #33 Exhibit 32 FILED UNDER SEAL, #34 Exhibit 33 FILED UNDER SEAL, #35 Exhibit 34 FILED UNDER SEAL, #36 Exhibit 35 FILED UNDER SEAL, #37 Exhibit 36 FILED UNDER SEAL, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 340 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, and Carlo Licata. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Hashmi Brief, #2 UNREDACTED Hashmi Brief, #3 REDACTED Dunn Brief, #4 UNREDACTED Dunn Brief)(Canty, Michael) (Filed on 4/16/2018) Modified on 4/19/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2018 Filing 339 EXHIBITS re #338 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 25 FILED UNDER SEAL filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 27 FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 28 FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 31 FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 32 FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 33 FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 34 FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 35 FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 36 FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 37, #13 Exhibit 38 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) #338 ) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 338 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment REDACTED, #2 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgmen, #4 Exhibit 1 FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 2 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 3 FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8 FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14 FILED UNDER SEAL, #18 Exhibit 15 FILED UNDER SEAL, #19 Exhibit 16 FILED UNDER SEAL, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18 FILED UNDER SEAL, #22 Exhibit 19 FILED UNDER SEAL, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21 FILED UNDER SEAL, #25 Exhibit 22 FILED UNDER SEAL, #26 Exhibit 23 FILED UNDER SEAL, #27 Exhibit 24 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 337 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #307 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Nadolenco Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Nadolenco Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Nadolenco Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Nadolenco Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Nadolenco Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Nadolenco Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Nadolenco Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Nadolenco Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Nadolenco Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Nadolenco Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to Nadolenco Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 to Nadolenco Declaration, #20 Exhibit 19 to Nadolenco Declaration, #21 Exhibit 20 to Nadolenco Declaration, #22 Exhibit 21 to Nadolenco Declaration)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 336 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Declaration - Redacted, #5 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Declaration - Unredacted, #6 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 to Nadolenco Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 to Nadolenco Declaration - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 8 to Nadolenco Declaration - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit 9 to Nadolenco Declaration, #11 Exhibit 16 to Nadolenco Declaration, #12 Exhibit 17 to Nadolenco Declaration, #13 Exhibit 19 to Nadolenco Declaration, #14 Exhibit 21 to Nadolenco Declaration, #15 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Redacted, #16 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - Unredacted)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 335 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #301 MOTION in Limine ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Nadolenco Declaration)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 334 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Declaration, #7 Redacted Opposition, #8 Unredacted Opposition)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION (Dkt. No. #255 ). Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/16/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #330 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark R. Winston. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 331 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Clayton P. Zellmer. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/30/2018. Replies due by 5/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chang, Albert) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 330 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mark Winston ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12270568.) filed by ADAM PEZEN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Winston, Mark) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #327 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lawrence A. Sucharow. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #326 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael P. Canty. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 327 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lawrence Sucharow ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12264446.) filed by ADAM PEZEN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sucharow, Lawrence) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 326 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Canty ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12263004.) filed by ADAM PEZEN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Canty, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 5/4/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/4/18. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 324 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/29/18, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (318 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Transcript Order, (317 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Transcript Order, (319 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 323 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu will convene a pre-settlement conference call to discuss timing and preparation for an in-person settlement conference. Judge Ryu anticipates that the phone call will last approximately 20-30 minutes. The conference call shall take place on 4/17/2018 10:00 AM. Lead Counsel for all parties shall participate. Counsel will receive the call-in information via e-mail from Judge Ryu's courtroom deputy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 322 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER by Judge James Donato in case 3:15-cv-03747-JD; granting (158) Administrative Motion to relate cases in case 3:16-cv-00937-JD. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 320 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/29/2018 before Judge James Donato by Frederick William Gullen, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Milian, David) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/29/2018 before Judge James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 318 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/29/2018 before Judge James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 317 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/29/2018 before Judge James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 29, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Selection set for 7/9/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 7/9/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #303 MOTION to Strike Motion to Exclude Hashmi Report, Opinions, and Testimony, #299 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #305 MOTION to Strike or Exclude Dunn Report, #301 MOTION in Limine , #307 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 316 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 3/29/2018. Total Time in Court: 35 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 315 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In Support of Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #285 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER re #312 . The Court will address case scheduling issues at the upcoming summary judgment and class certification hearing set for March 29, 2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 313 NOTICE by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel regarding oral argument on motion for class certification (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 312 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Case Schedule, Dispositive Motions and Trial filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #308 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Vincent J. Connelly. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #309 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Rayfield. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 309 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Facebook, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12202545.) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Rayfield, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 308 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12201254.) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Admission To the Bar of Illinois)(Connelly, Vincent) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 307 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/16/2018. Replies due by 4/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment REDACTED, #2 Exhibit 1 FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 2 FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 3 FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 6 FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 7 FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 8 FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 9 FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 10 FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 11 FILED UNDER SEAL, #13 Exhibit 12 FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14 FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit 15 FILED UNDER SEAL, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19 FILED UNDER SEAL, #21 Exhibit 20 FILED UNDER SEAL, #22 Exhibit 21 FILED UNDER SEAL, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24 FILED UNDER SEAL, #26 Exhibit 25 FILED UNDER SEAL, #27 Exhibit 26 FILED UNDER SEAL, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28 FILED UNDER SEAL, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30 FILED UNDER SEAL, #32 Proposed Order)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 306 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof REDACTED, #2 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment REDACTED, #4 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 1 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 2 FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 3 FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5 FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 6 FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 7 FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 8 FILED UNDER SEAL, #13 Exhibit 9 FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 10 FILED UNDER SEAL, #15 Exhibit 11 FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit 12 FILED UNDER SEAL, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14 FILED UNDER SEAL, #19 Exhibit 15 FILED UNDER SEAL, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19 FILED UNDER SEAL, #24 Exhibit 20 FILED UNDER SEAL, #25 Exhibit 21 FILED UNDER SEAL, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24 FILED UNDER SEAL, #29 Exhibit 25 FILED UNDER SEAL, #30 Exhibit 26 FILED UNDER SEAL, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28 FILED UNDER SEAL, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30 FILED UNDER SEAL, #35 Proposed Order)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 305 MOTION to Strike or Exclude Dunn Report filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/16/2018. Replies due by 4/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 1 to Nadolenco Decl., #3 2 to Nadolenco Decl., #4 3 to Nadolenco Decl., #5 4 to Nadolenco Decl., #6 5 to Nadolenco Decl., #7 6 to Nadolenco Decl., #8 7 to Nadolenco Decl., #9 8 to Nadolenco Decl., #10 9 to Nadolenco Decl., #11 10 to Nadolenco Decl., #12 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 304 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #2 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Decl. - REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #4 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Decl. - REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #6 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #7 Exhibit 7 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #8 Exhibit 8 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #9 Exhibit 9 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #10 Motion to Strike or Exclude Dunn Report - REDACTED, #11 Motion to Strike or Exclude Dunn Report - UNREDACTED)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 303 MOTION to Strike Motion to Exclude Hashmi Report, Opinions, and Testimony filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/16/2018. Replies due by 4/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Nadolenco Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to Nadolenco Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 to Nadolenco Decl., #11 Exhibit 10 to Nadolenco Decl., #12 Exhibit 11 to Nadolenco Decl., #13 Exhibit 12 to Nadolenco Decl., #14 Exhibit 13 to Nadolenco Decl., #15 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 302 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #2 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #3 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Decl. - REDACTED, #4 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #5 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Decl. - REDACTED, #6 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #7 Exhibit 9 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #8 Motion to Exclude Hashmi Report, Opinions, and Testimony - REDACTED, #9 Motion to Exclude Hashmi Report, Opinions, and Testimony - UNREDACTED)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 301 MOTION in Limine filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/16/2018. Replies due by 4/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Proposed Expert Matthew Turk, Ph.D. REDACTED, #2 Exhibit 1 FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 2 FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 3 FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 4 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 8 FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 9 FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11 FILED UNDER SEAL, #13 Proposed Order)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 300 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Proposed Expert Matthew Turk, Ph.D.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof REDACTED, #2 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Proposed Expert Matthew Turk, Ph.D.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Proposed Expert Matthew Turk, Ph.D. REDACTED, #4 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Proposed Expert Matthew Turk, Ph.D. FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 1 FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 2 FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 3 FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 4 FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7 FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 8 FILED UNDER SEAL, #13 Exhibit 9 FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11 FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Proposed Order)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 299 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 4/16/2018. Replies due by 4/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 to Nadolenco Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 to Nadolenco Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 to Nadolenco Decl., #11 Exhibit 10 to Nadolenco Decl., #12 Exhibit 11 to Nadolenco Decl., #13 Exhibit 12 to Nadolenco Decl., #14 Exhibit 13 to Nadolenco Decl., #15 Exhibit 14 to Nadolenco Decl., #16 Exhibit 15 to Nadolenco Decl., #17 Exhibit 16 to Nadolenco Decl., #18 Exhibit 17 to Nadolenco Decl., #19 Exhibit 18 to Nadolenco Decl., #20 Exhibit 19 to Nadolenco Decl., #21 Declaration of Robert Sherman, #22 Exhibit 1 to Sherman Decl., #23 Exhibit 2 to Sherman Decl., #24 Exhibit 3 to Sherman Decl., #25 Exhibit 4 to Sherman Decl., #26 Exhibit 5 to Sherman Decl., #27 Exhibit 6 to Sherman Decl., #28 Exhibit 7 to Sherman Decl., #29 Exhibit 8 to Sherman Decl., #30 Exhibit 9 to Sherman Decl., #31 Exhibit 10 to Sherman Decl., #32 Exhibit 11 to Sherman Decl., #33 Exhibit 12 to Sherman Decl., #34 Exhibit 13 to Sherman Decl., #35 Exhibit 14 to Sherman Decl., #36 Exhibit 15 to Sherman Decl., #37 Declaration of Yaniv Taigman, #38 Exhibit 1 to Taigman Decl., #39 Exhibit 2 to Taigman Decl., #40 Declaration of Dan Barak, #41 Exhibit 1 to Barak Decl., #42 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 298 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Decl. - UNREDACTED, #2 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #3 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Decl. REDACTED, #4 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #5 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Decl. REDACTED, #6 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #7 Exhibit 7 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #8 Exhibit 8 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #9 Exhibit 9 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #10 Exhibit 10 to Nadolenco Decl. REDACTED, #11 Exhibit 10 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #12 Exhibit 11 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #13 Exhibit 13 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #14 Exhibit 14 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #15 Exhibit 15 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #16 Exhibit 16 to Nadolenco Decl. REDACTED, #17 Exhibit 16 to Nadolenco Decl. UNREDACTED, #18 Exhibit 12 to Sherman Decl. UNREDACTED, #19 Exhibit 14 to Sherman Decl. UNREDACTED, #20 Exhibit 15 to Sherman Decl. UNREDACTED, #21 Exhibit 2 to Taigman Decl. UNREDACTED, #22 Exhibit 1 to Barak Decl. UNREDACTED, #23 Motion for Summary Judgment REDACTED, #24 Motion for Summary Judgment - UNREDACTED)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER. The proposed dates at #295 are fine. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/15/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 296 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alexander Glenn Tievsky (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 295 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Oppositions and Replies to the Dispositive and Daubert Motions filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER re #227 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/26/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 293 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit 3 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 3 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #4 Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #6 Exhibit 5 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment REDACTED, #7 Exhibit 5 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #8 Exhibit 11 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment REDACTED, #9 Exhibit 11 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #10 Exhibit 17 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment REDACTED, #11 Exhibit 17 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #12 Exhibit 29 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment REDACTED, #13 Exhibit 29 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #14 Exhibit 30 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment REDACTED, #15 Exhibit 30 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #16 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment REDACTED, #17 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment UNREDACTED, #18 Facebook's Opposition to Class Certification REDACTED, #19 Facebook's Opposition to Class Certification UNREDACTED, #20 Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply REDACTED, #21 Exhibit 4 to Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply UNREDACTED, #22 Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply REDACTED, #23 Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply UNREDACTED, #24 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 9, 2018 Filing 292 REPLY (re #255 MOTION to Certify Class ) Reply in Support of Class Certification filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Licata Dep Excerpts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Patel Dep Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - Pezen Dep Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 4 - Submitted Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Submitted Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Balabanian Declaration)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 9, 2018 Filing 291 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Class Certification filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Class Certification, #2 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Class Certification, #3 Exhibit 4 to the Reply in Support of Class Certification (submitted entirely under seal), #4 Exhibit 5 to the Reply in Support of Class Certification (submitted entirely under seal))(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #289 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher C. Gold. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 7, 2018 Filing 289 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Christopher C. Gold ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12090938.) filed by Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gold, Christopher) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 6, 2018 Filing 288 NOTICE of Appearance by John Hamilton George (George, John) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 287 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Shawn A. Williams (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER re #130 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD. The Court clarifies that the January 2, 2018 order on sealing procedures applies to all filings going forward. Dkt. No. #123 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD; Dkt. No. 276 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/2/18. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 285 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #255 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Strahs, #2 Exhibit 1 to Strahs Declaration, #3 Declaration of Qizhen Ruan, #4 Declaration of Omry Yadan, #5 Exhibit 1 to Yadan Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to Yadan Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to Yadan Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4 to Yadan Declaration, #9 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #10 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration, #11 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Declaration, #12 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Declaration, #13 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Declaration, #14 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Declaration, #15 Exhibit 6 to Nadolenco Declaration, #16 Exhibit 7 to Nadolenco Declaration, #17 Exhibit 8 to Nadolenco Declaration, #18 Exhibit 9 to Nadolenco Declaration, #19 Exhibit 10 to Nadolenco Declaration, #20 Exhibit 11 to Nadolenco Declaration, #21 Exhibit 12 to Nadolenco Declaration, #22 Exhibit 13 to Nadolenco Declaration, #23 Exhibit 14 to Nadolenco Declaration)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 284 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Facebook's Opposition to Class Certification REDACTED, #2 Facebook's Opposition to Class Certification UNREDACTED, #3 Declaration of Benjamin Strahs REDACTED, #4 Declaration of Benjamin Strahs UNREDACTED, #5 Exhibit 1 to Strahs Declaration UNREDACTED, #6 Declaration of Qizhen Ruan REDACTED, #7 Declaration of Qizhen Ruan UNREDACTED, #8 Declaration of Omry Yadan REDACTED, #9 Declaration of Omry Yadan UNREDACTED, #10 Exhibit 1 to Yadan Declaration UNREDACTED, #11 Exhibit 2 to Yadan Declaration UNREDACTED, #12 Exhibit 3 to Yadan Declaration UNREDACTED, #13 Exhibit 4 to Yadan Declaration UNREDACTED, #14 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration REDACTED, #15 Exhibit 1 to Nadolenco Declaration UNREDACTED, #16 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Declaration REDACTED, #17 Exhibit 2 to Nadolenco Declaration UNREDACTED, #18 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Declaration REDACTED, #19 Exhibit 3 to Nadolenco Declaration UNREDACTED, #20 Exhibit 4 to Nadolenco Declaration UNREDACTED, #21 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Declaration REDACTED, #22 Exhibit 5 to Nadolenco Declaration UNREDACTED, #23 Exhibit 8 to Nadolenco Declaration UNREDACTED, #24 Exhibit 9 to Nadolenco Declaration UNREDACTED, #25 Exhibit 10 to Nadolenco Declaration UNREDACTED, #26 Exhibit 14 to Nadolenco Declaration UNREDACTED)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER. Facebook's objections to the production of documents exchanged with NetChoice is overruled. Dkt. No. 282. The NDA Facebook relies upon does not establish an attorney-client relationship or other basis for withholding the documents. The protective order in this case will allow Facebook to maintain the confidentiality of the documents. Facebook will provide the withheld documents to plaintiffs by January 29, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Donato, James) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 282 Letter dated 12/22/2017 re discovery from Matthew D. Provance. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER. The hearings on summary judgment and class certification are continued to March 29, 2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/18/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 280 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearings on Summary Judgment and Class Certification filed by Frederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams, #2 Proposed Order Continuing Hearings)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 279 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to (255 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) MOTION to Certify Class , (108 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD) MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 278 REPLY (re #257 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Provance, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 277 Interim Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit 1 (UNREDACTED), #3 Exhibit 2 (UNREDACTED), #4 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), #5 Exhibit 3 (UNREDACTED), #6 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED), #7 Exhibit 4 (UNREDACTED), #8 Reply (REDACTED), #9 Reply (UNREDACTED))(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER. The Court is willing to try Facebook's proposed approach to the motions to seal. Dkt. No. #274 . The parties are directed to include sealing motions for the motions to dismiss in the joint filing. Please make sure to organize the sealing requests in a way that makes it easy for the Court to understand which substantive motion the request goes with. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/2/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER. The reply may be filed on January 5, 2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/29/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 26, 2017 Filing 274 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Regarding Materials Provisionally Filed Under Seal in Connection with the Parties Pending Motions for Class Certification and Summary Judgment filed by Facebook Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 Filing 273 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for an Extension of time to file its Reply in Support of Facebook's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Facebook Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 22, 2017 Filing 272 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #257 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byFrederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30)(Hall, David) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 22, 2017 Filing 271 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Frederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. Responses due by 12/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition to Facebook's Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Opposition to Facebook's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Proof of Service)(Hall, David) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Order denying #262 Administrative Motion entered by Judge James Donato. The request to continue is denied. Plaintiffs should make any procedural or substantive arguments against summary judgment in the opposition brief. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 18, 2017 Filing 269 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #263 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byFrederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Richman, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 268 EXHIBITS re #254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 Yadan Depo Transcript (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 Yadan Depo Transcript (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit 4 Taigman Depo Transcript, Licata version (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 4 Taigman Depo Transcript, Licata version (Unredacted), #5. Exhibit 5 Sherman Depo Transcript (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 5 Sherman Depo Transcript (Unredacted), #7 Motion for Class Certification (Redacted), #8 Motion for Class Certification (Unredacted), #9 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #254 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (264) Administrative Motion in case 3:15-cv-03747-JD; granting (114) Administrative Motion in case 3:16-cv-00937-JD. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 266 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #262 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Summarily Deny or Continue Facebook's re #257 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 265 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Telephone Conference held on 12/15/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2017)
December 13, 2017 Filing 264 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification filed by Facebook Inc.. Responses due by 12/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Filing 263 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Unredacted Version of Proposed Letter, #3 Redacted Version of Proposed Letter, #4 Exhibit A to Proposed Letter, #5 Exhibit B to Proposed Letter, #6 Exhibit C to Proposed Letter, #7 Exhibit D to Proposed Letter, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Filing 262 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Summarily Deny or Continue Facebook's re #257 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Frederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. Responses due by 12/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (259) Stipulation in case 3:15-cv-03747-JD; granting (110) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00937-JD. At the parties' joint request, the parties will have until December 18, 2017 to file their declarations in support of filings under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER. The Court sets a phone call to discuss the discovery dispute, Dkt. Nos. #243 , #252 , on Friday, December 15, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by noon on Wednesday to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/12/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 11, 2017 Filing 259 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Declarations in Support of Filings Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 11, 2017 Filing 258 Proposed Order re #257 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Facebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 257 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/22/2017. Replies due by 12/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Declaration, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 255 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/12/2018. Replies due by 1/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Class Cert Motion, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Adam Pezen, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Carlo Licata, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Nimesh Patel, #5 Exhibit Excerpts of Pezen Deposition, #6 Exhibit Excerpts of Licata Deposition, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Joel Bernstein, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Rafey Balabanian, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Shawn Williams)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Balabanian Declaration ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit 1 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #6 Exhibit 2 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #7 Exhibit 3 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #8 Exhibit 4 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #9 Exhibit 5 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #10 Exhibit 6 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #11 Exhibit 7 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #12 Exhibit 8 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #13 Exhibit 9 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #14 Exhibit 11 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #15 Exhibit 12 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #16 Exhibit 13 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #17 Exhibit 14 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #18 Exhibit 15 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #19 Exhibit 16 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #20 Exhibit 17 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #21 Exhibit 18 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #22 Exhibit 19 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #23 Exhibit 20 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #24 Exhibit 21 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #25 Exhibit 22 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #26 Exhibit 23 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #27 Exhibit 24 to Class Cert Motion (entirely under seal), #28 Proof of Service of Declaration ISO Motion to Seal)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 253 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-30-2017, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #251 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2018. (Related documents(s) #251 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 252 Letter from John Nadolenco to Judge Donato re Plaintiffs' November 24, 2017 Discovery Dispute Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 251 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 30, 2017 before Judge James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Provance, Matthew) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 30, 2017 Filing 250 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 30, 2017 before Judge James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Hall, David) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 Filing 249 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2017 re (227 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Facebook Inc., (93 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD) MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Facebook, Inc. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 248 EXHIBITS re #242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Amended Appendex A filed byFrederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Related document(s) #242 ) (Rhodes, Corban) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 247 EXHIBITS re #242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Appendix B filed byFrederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Related document(s) #242 ) (Rhodes, Corban) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 29, 2017 Filing 246 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d (Eichenberger v. ESPN, Inc.) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 11/29/2017)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER. The Court would like a response from Facebook to plaintiffs' discovery letter, Dkt. No. #243 , by 12/5/17 at 5:00 p.m. Also, plaintiffs are directed to re-file legible copies of the exhibits to the discovery letter by 11/29/17 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/27/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
November 27, 2017 Filing 244 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Its Renewed Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #227 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 24, 2017 Filing 243 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Frederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A & B)(Rhodes, Corban) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 24, 2017 Filing 242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Frederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Corban S. Rhodes, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted version of Appendix A, #4 Unredacted version of Appendix B, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service of Declaration of Corban S. Rhodes)(Rhodes, Corban) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 241 NOTICE by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel regarding oral argument on Facebook's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction (Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER. At the parties' request, Dkt. No. #237 , plaintiff Nimesh Patel may be deposed by Facebook on or before December 7, 2017. No other case deadlines are changed. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/9/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 239 REPLY (re #227 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 238 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 1, 2017 Filing 237 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Depose Plaintiff Nimesh Patel After the November 17, 2017 Cut-off for Completing Fact Discovery filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 26, 2017 Filing 236 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #227 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rafey S. Balabanian)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #234 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin H. Richman. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 234 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11818418.) filed by Carlo Licata. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Richman, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER. At the parties' request, the briefing schedule for Facebook's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 227 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD, Dkt. No. 93 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD) is as follows: Responses due by 10/26/17. Replies due by 11/2/17. Hearing set for 11/30/17 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/12/17. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 12, 2017 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by Lily E. Hough (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 231 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(1) filed by Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Hall, David) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 230 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Shawn A. Williams of Amanda M. Frame Pursuant to L.R. 5-1(c)(2)(C) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER. Facebook's request to modify the scheduling order, Dkt. No. (224) in case 3:15-cv-03747-JD; Dkt. No. (92) in case 3:16-cv-00937-JD, is denied. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/6/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER. For the parties' discovery dispute, Dkt. No. 221 in 15-cv-3747; Dkt. No. 89 in 16-cv-937, Facebook's objections are overruled with respect to FBBIPA_00008942-44, FBBIPA_00009230-31, FBBIPA_009283-87, and FBBIPA_00028670-71. Facebook is directed to produce to plaintiffs by October 10, 2017, unredacted versions of these documents. The objections are otherwise sustained. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/2/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 227 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/12/2017. Replies due by 10/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #4 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 226 REPLY (re #224 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order re #223 Case Management Scheduling Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 26, 2017 Filing 225 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #224 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order re #223 Case Management Scheduling Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, ) filed byFrederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Hall, David) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 224 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order re #223 Case Management Scheduling Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Facebook Inc.. Responses due by 9/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Expert Discovery due by 3/2/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 11/17/2017. Designation of Experts due by 12/22/2017. Dispositive Motion due by 3/16/2018. Rebuttal Reports due by 2/2/2018. Jury Selection set for 5/21/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/11/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 222 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/7/2017, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (220 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Transcript Order, (219 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2017. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 221 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Hearing on motion to stay discovery, discovery dispute held on 9/7/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 220 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/07/17 before Hon. James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Hall, David) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 219 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/7/2017 before Hon. James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Provance, Matthew) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 218 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT . JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook Inc., Frederick William Gullen. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 217 EXHIBITS re #209 Discovery Letter Brief (Exhibit C to Discovery Letter Brief) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) #209 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 29, 2017 Filing 216 Letter from Frank S. Hedin, Shawn A. Williams, Rafey S. Balabanian, Joel H. Bernstein in Response to Defendant's Letter Motion Dated July 14, 2017. (Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge James Donato denying (208), (211) Administrative Motions to File Under Seal in case 3:15-cv-03747-JD; denying (78), (81) Administrative Motions to File Under Seal in case 3:16-cv-00937-JD. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 24, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (209 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Discovery Letter Brief, (204 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Renew Motion to Stay re (196) MOTION to Stay Discovery and Protective Order , (211 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , (81 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , (76 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Renew Motion to Stay re (71) MOTION to Stay Discovery and Protective Order , (79 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD) Discovery Letter Brief. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER. In addition to the status conference, the Court will take up on September 7, 2017, the parties' discovery disputes, Dkt. Nos. #209 , #211 , and Facebook's motion to stay, Dkt. No. #196 . This discussion will resolve the same disputes in Gullen . Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/24/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 18, 2017 Filing 213 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc. re #212 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibit A [Revised] Unredacted Document Sought to be Sealed (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 18, 2017 Filing 212 EXHIBITS re #211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Declaration of John Nadolenco in Support of) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A-Unredacted, #3 Exhibit B-Redacted)(Related document(s) #211 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 211 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Frederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of Document Sought to Be Sealed, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of F. Hedin, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Document Sought to Be Sealed)(Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER re (209 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Facebook Inc., (79 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Facebook, Inc. The Court calls for plaintiffs to respond by August 14, 2017. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/4/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 209 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 208 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service of Declaration of John Nadolenco)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 207 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #204 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Renew Motion to Stay re #196 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Protective Order ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 206 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #204 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Renew Motion to Stay re #196 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Protective Order ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 20, 2017 ***erroneous entry*** (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017) Modified on 6/20/2017 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2017 Filing 205 Correction of Opposition/Response dates re #204 . Responses due by 6/23/2017 filed by Facebook Inc (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 6/19/2017) Modified on 6/20/2017 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2017 Filing 204 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Renew Motion to Stay re #196 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Protective Order filed by Facebook Inc.. Responses due by 6/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #3 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER re (202 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Joint Request for Status Conference. The Court sets a status conference for 9/7/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/16/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 202 NOTICE by Frederick William Gullen, Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel Joint Request for Status Conference (Hall, David) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
March 31, 2017 Filing 201 NOTICE by Carlo Licata of Change in Counsel (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER STAYING CASE FOR 90 DAYS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/27/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
February 24, 2017 Filing 199 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Case for 90 Days filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 198 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/22/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/23/2017)
February 22, 2017 Filing 197 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/22/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 196 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Protective Order filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 3/7/2017. Replies due by 3/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 195 Letter from Shawn A. Williams . (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Order by Hon. James Donato denying Facebook, Inc.'s #184 Administrative Motion for Consideration of Untimely Declaration in Support of Sealing. The untimeliness of Facebook's declaration is unexcused, and it fails to meet the Ninth Circuit standard for sealing in any event. See, e.g., Open Text S.A. v. Box, Inc., Case No. 13-cv-4910-JD, 2014 WL 7368594, at *1 (N.D. Cal. Dec. 26, 2014) ("good cause" standard for non-dispositive motions still requires "particularized showing"). Plaintiffs are directed to file an unredacted version of their letter on the public record by February 20, 2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER. The pending motions to dismiss in these related cases, Dkt. No. 129 in Case No. 15-3747 and Dkt. No. 40 in Case No. 16-937, seek dismissal under Spokeo, Inc. v. Robins, 136 S. Ct. 1540 (2016). There, the Supreme Court vacated the Ninth Circuit's decision because the Circuit had "failed to fully appreciate the distinction between concreteness and particularization, [and so] its [Article III] standing analysis was incomplete." Id. at 1550. The Supreme Court remanded the case for further proceedings consistent with the Court's opinion. The case was argued and submitted on remand on December 13, 2016. See Robins v. Spokeo, Case No. 11-56843 (9th Cir.), Dkt. No. 108. Given that the Ninth Circuit currently has the case under submission, the Court finds it advisable to wait for the Ninth Circuit's guidance on the Article III issues raised by defendant's motions in these cases. The Court consequently terminates the pending motions for administrative purposes. Defendant may renew the motions by filing notices of renewal after the Ninth Circuit has issued its decision in Robins. If, after reviewing the forthcoming decision, the parties wish to file supplemental briefs, they may jointly propose a schedule for the Court's consideration. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/7/2017. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 7, 2017 Filing 192 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #189 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 7, 2017 Filing 191 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #189 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief ) filed byFrederick William Gullen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Response to Supplemental Brief)(Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting as modified (188) stipulation in case no. 3:15-cv-03747-JD and amending scheduling order. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 189 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed by Facebook Inc.. Responses due by 2/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit A to the Proposed Brief, #4 Exhibit B to the Proposed Brief, #5 Exhibit C to the Proposed Brief, #6 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 31, 2017 Filing 188 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #137 Order, Terminate Motions to Extend the Fact Discovery Cut-Off filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 20, 2017 Filing 187 ***erroneous docket entry***Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Claims Construction Hearing held on 1/19/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2017) Modified on 1/20/2017 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2017 Filing 186 NOTICE by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel re 182 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Facebook, Inc.'s Motion for Consideration of Untimely Declaration in Support of Sealing Confidential Information Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5 (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by David Philip Milian on behalf of Interested Party Frederick William Gullen (Milian, David) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 10, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #184 Motion for Consideration of Its Untimely Declaration in Support of Sealing Confidential Information. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) Modified on 1/11/2017 (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2017 Filing 184 Motion for Consideration of Its Untimely Declaration in Support of Sealing Confidential Information Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed byFacebook Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit A - Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B - Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #173 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 1/10/2017) Modified on 1/11/2017 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/11/2017 (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2017 Filing 183 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 1/5/2017. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/9/2017)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Order by Hon. James Donato denying #173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The Designating Party, Facebook, has failed to timely file a declaration in support of sealing as required by Civil Local Rule 79-5(e)(1). The motion to seal, Dkt. No. 173, is consequently denied, and pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e)(2), plaintiffs are ordered to file an unredacted version of their letter on the public record no earlier than 4 days and no later than 10 days from today's date. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 9, 2017 Filing 181 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/5/2017, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number 415 531 6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (180 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Transcript Order, (179 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2017. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 9, 2017 Filing 180 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/05/2017 before Hon. James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 9, 2017 Filing 179 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/05/2017 before Hon. James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Provance, Matthew) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER re (177 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Clerk's Notice, (175 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD, 175 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD). The Court clarifies that today's discovery call includes Gullen. Counsel should follow the CourtCall procedures in the prior notice. (Donato, James) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 29, 2016 Filing 177 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephonic Discovery Hearing Re: Dkts 168 and 173 reset to 1/5/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. James Donato. This hearing was moved to 1/12/17 in error. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 29, 2016 Filing 176 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NOS. #168 , #173 . Notice is hereby given that the motion hearings previously set for January 5, 2017, are continued to January 12, 2017, before Judge James Donato, at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER. The Court sets a telephonic discovery hearing for January 5, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. to resolve the issues raised by the parties' discovery dispute letters, Dkt. Nos. 168 & 173-4. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by January 4, 2017, to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/28/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Frame (Frame, Amanda) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Letter Regarding Discovery, #4 Unredacted Version of Letter Regarding Discovery)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #171 Stipulation to Extend Time. Plaintiffs' discovery dispute letter is due on Monday, November 28, 2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 171 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Letter Regarding Discovery filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hall, David) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 170 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. re #169 Amended Answer to Complaint of Constitutional Question (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 169 AMENDED ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint byFacebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 168 Discovery Letter Brief re Outstanding Discovery Disputes filed by Facebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 6, 2016 Filing 167 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/27/2016, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #164 Transcript Order, #165 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Related documents(s) #164 , #165 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 11/6/2016)
November 6, 2016 Filing 166 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/27/2016, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #164 Transcript Order, #165 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Related documents(s) #164 , #165 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 11/6/2016) Modified on 11/7/2016 (fff, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2016 Filing 165 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 27, 2016 before Hon. James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 163 *** DISREGARD - ORDERED IN ERROR *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/28/2016) Modified on 10/28/2016 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2016 Filing 162 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 10/27/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 161 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, David) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 160 REPLY (re #151 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 159 RESPONSE (re #151 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Larry, J.) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 11, 2016 Filing 158 Letter from Shawn A. Williams and John Nadolenco to Judge Donato re Discovery. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 154 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #129 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/30/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 152 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Discovery Hearing held on 9/30/2016.Total Time in Court 11 minutes. Court Reporter Name Not Reported. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #95 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #97 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/30/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #97 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 151 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #3 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER. The Court sets a telephonic discovery hearing for September 30, 2016, at 11:30 a.m. to discuss the issues raised by the parties' discovery dispute letters. Dkt. Nos. 146, 149. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 in advance of the call to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/27/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 149 Letter from John Nadolenco to Judge Donato re Plaintiffs' September 14, 2016 Discovery Dispute Letter. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re plaintiffs' #146 discovery dispute letter. Defendant Facebook is directed to file a response by September 26, 2016. The response should not exceed three pages and should otherwise comply with the Court's Standing Order for Civil Discovery. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/20/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #143 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander G. Tievsky. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 146 Letter from Shawn A. Williams to Judge Donato re Discovey Dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER re (129 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and (40 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The Court continues the hearing on these motions from September 15, 2016, to October 27, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/9/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #141 Stipulation re Discovery of ESI. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 9, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing re (129 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, (40 in 3:16-cv-00937-JD) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 7, 2016 Filing 143 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10747567.) filed by Carlo Licata. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Tievsky, Alexander) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 30, 2016 Filing 142 EXHIBITS re #141 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information Table 1 filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Related document(s) #141 ) (Hall, David) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 30, 2016 Filing 141 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Hall, David) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 25, 2016 Filing 140 REPLY (re #129 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 139 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #129 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 4, 2016 Filing 138 RESPONSE (re #129 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 27, 2016 Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Jury Selection set for 10/2/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Trial set for 10/2/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/27/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 15, 2016 Filing 136 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Case Management Schedule filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting (134) Stipulation in case 3:15-cv-03747-JD; granting (43) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00937-JD. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 13, 2016 Filing 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule For Motions to Dismiss For Lack of Standing, Document 129 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 13, 2016 Filing 133 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 29, 2016, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (132 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Transcript Order, (131 in 3:15-cv-03747-JD) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2016. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 12, 2016 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/29/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Facebook Inc., for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Provance, Matthew) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 6, 2016 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/29/2016 before Hon. James Donato by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 7/6/2016)
July 1, 2016 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/29/2016.FTR Time 1:34-1:56. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/1/2016). Modified on 7/7/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2016 Filing 129 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 7/13/2016. Replies due by 7/20/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 28, 2016 Filing 128 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Plaintiffs' Revised Proposed Case Management Schedule in Connection with the June 29, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 22, 2016 Filing 127 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 2, 2016 Filing 126 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byFacebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
June 2, 2016 Filing 125 ADR Clerk's Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Non-Compliance. (re: #124 Notice of Non-Compliance with Court Order). This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
June 2, 2016 Filing 124 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 27, 2016 Filing 123 Statement re #116 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rafey S. Balabanian)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #121 Stipulated Request to Change Deadline to Answer Complaint and Time of Case Management Conference. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 121 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request to Change Deadline to Answer Complaint and Time of Case Management Conference filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 5, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order re Motion to Dismiss and Summary Judgment by Hon. James Donato. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/20/2016. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 118 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCarlo Licata. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sguoros v. TransUnion Corp., No. 15-1371 (7th Cir.))(Related document(s) 117 ) (Larry, J.) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #115 Administrative Motion. Plaintiffs' request is granted, and they may file a statement of recent decision as described in Civil Local Rule 7-3(d)(2), i.e., "containing a citation to and providing a copy of the new opinion -- without argument." (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #114 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Rafey S. Balabanian.(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 115 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File a Statement of Recent Decision re #109 Evidentiary Hearing, filed by Carlo Licata. Responses due by 4/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Rafey S. Balabanian)(Larry, J.) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 114 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10338628.) filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration of Rafey S. Balabanian in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 9, 2016 Filing 113 RESPONSE to re #106 Declaration in Opposition, by Facebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 112 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/2/16, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #108 Transcript Order, #110 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2016. (Related documents(s) #108 , #110 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 3, 2016 Filing 111 Declaration of Joachim De Lombaert in Support of Evidentiary Hearing Argument filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 3, 2016 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 3, 2016 Filing 109 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/2/2016. Total Time in Court 3:06. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit and Witness List) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2016)
March 2, 2016 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew D. Provance..(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
March 1, 2016 Filing 106 DECLARATION of Shawn A. Williams in Opposition to #96 Trial Brief,,,, Declaration of Shawn A. Williams Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Related document(s) #96 ) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
March 1, 2016 Filing 105 OBJECTIONS to re #96 Trial Brief,,,, Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Objections and Responses to Documents Submitted in Support of Defendant's Pre-Hearing Brief by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #102 Facebook, Inc.'s Request Regarding Courtroom Equipment for March 2, 2016 Hearing. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
March 1, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. of Lodging of Deposition Transcripts (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
March 1, 2016 Filing 102 MOTION requests permission to bring equipment for March 2, 2016 Hearing filed by Facebook Inc.. Responses due by 3/15/2016. Replies due by 3/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 29, 2016 Filing 101 Declaration of John Nadolenco in Support of #97 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 29, 2016 Filing 100 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10248422.) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Provance, Matthew) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 26, 2016 Filing 99 NOTICE by Frederick William Gullen re #44 Order Relating Case, 89 Clerk's Notice, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hedin, Frank) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 25, 2016 Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/24/2016.(jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2016)
February 24, 2016 Filing 97 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Hall, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams, #6 Exhibit 1 - 1 of 2 - Unredacted Version, #7 Exhibit 1 - 2 of 2 - Unredacted Version, #8 Exhibit 2 - Unredacted Version, #9 Exhibit 3 - 1 of 2 - Unredacted Version, #10 Exhibit 3 - 2 of 2 - Unredacted Version, #11 Exhibit 4 - Unredacted Version, #12 Exhibit 5 - Unredacted Version, #13 Exhibit 6 - Unredacted Version, #14 Exhibit 7 - Unredacted Version, #15 Exhibit 8 - Unredacted Version, #16 Exhibit 9 - 1 of 3 - Unredacted Version, #17 Exhibit 9 2- 2 of 3 - Unredacted Version, #18 Exhibit 9 - 3 of 3 - Unredacted Version, #19 Exhibit 10 - Unredacted Version, #20 Exhibit 11 - Unredacted Version, #21 Exhibit 12 - Unredacted Version, #22 Exhibit 13 - Unredacted Version)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 24, 2016 Filing 96 TRIAL BRIEF by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Nadolenco, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of J. Nadolenco, #3 Exhibit B to Decl. of J. Nadolenco, #4 Exhibit C to Decl. of J. Nadolenco, #5 Exhibit D to Decl. of J. Nadolenco, #6 Exhibit E to Decl. of J. Nadolenco, #7 Exhibit F to Decl. of J. Nadolenco, #8 Declaration Redacted Version of Decl. of De Lombaert, #9 Exhibit A to Decl. of De Lombaert, #10 Exhibit B to Decl. of De Lombaert, #11 Exhibit C to Decl. of De Lombaert, #12 Exhibit D to Decl. of De Lombaert, #13 Exhibit E to Decl. of De Lombaert, #14 Exhibit F to Decl. of De Lombaert, #15 Declaration of M. Pike, #16 Exhibit A to Decl. of M. Pike, #17 Exhibit B to Decl. of M. Pike, #18 Exhibit C to Decl. of M. Pike, #19 Exhibit D to Decl. of M. Pike, #20 Exhibit E to Decl. of M. Pike, #21 Exhibit F to Decl. of M. Pike, #22 Exhibit G to Decl. of M. Pike, #23 Exhibit H to Decl. of M. Pike, #24 Declaration of S. Chance)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 24, 2016 Filing 95 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Trial Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Trial Brief, #5 Redacted Version of De Lombaert, #6 Unredacted Version of De Lombaert, #7 Exhibit A Sealed Version, #8 Exhibit B Sealed Version, #9 Exhibit C Sealed Version, #10 Exhibit D Sealed Version, #11 Exhibit E Sealed Version, #12 Exhibit F Sealed Version)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 24, 2016 Filing 94 ** ORDER CANCELLED (The 2/24/16 Telephone conference was not reported nor recorded, so no transcript is possible.) **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 2/24/2016) Modified on 2/24/2016 (djc, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2016 Filing 93 ** ORDER CANCELLED (The 2/24/16 Telephone conference was not reported nor recorded, so no transcript is possible.) **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/24/2016) Modified on 2/24/2016 (djc, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2016 Filing 92 ** ORDER CANCELLED (The 2/24/16 Telephone conference was not reported nor recorded, so no transcript is possible.) **TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc. for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/24/2016) Modified on 2/24/2016 (djc, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re #90 Letter filed by Facebook Inc. The Court sets a telephonic status conference for 2/24/2016 at 11:30 AM to discuss Facebook's letter and the upcoming evidentiary hearing. The parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 no later than 2 hours in advance of the call to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/23/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 23, 2016 Filing 90 Letter from Facebook, Inc. re March 2, 2016 hearing. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 89 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Evidentiary Hearing moved to 3/2/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #87 Stipulated Protective Order. The parties' stipulated protective order is approved, except that in those cases where the stipulated protective order conflicts with the Court's standing orders (e.g., with respect to the filing of discovery motions), the Court's standing orders will control. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 10, 2016 Filing 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Facebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 5, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel re #73 Opposition/Response to Motion Notice of Recent Authority Concerning Interpretation of Illinois Biometric Information Privacy Act (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 21, 2015 Filing 85 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/16/15, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Official Reporter, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #84 Transcript Order, #81 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2016. (Related documents(s) #84 , #81 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2015. re #69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook Inc. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/2/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato.Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 18, 2015 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 80 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 79 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Larry, J.) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 78 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Facebook Inc. filed by Facebook Inc.. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 77 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 76 REPLY (re #69 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca B. Johns, #2 Exhibit A)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 11, 2015 Filing 75 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/11/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 74 OBJECTIONS to re #70 Request for Judicial Notice, by Carlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Nguyen, Alexander) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 73 RESPONSE (re #69 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCarlo Licata, ADAM PEZEN, Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Alexander T.H. Nguyen)(Nguyen, Alexander) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 6, 2015 Filing 72 The Court grants defendants' #71 request to move the Case Management Conference to 12/16/15 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, Floor 19, San Francisco. Deadlines for events associated with the Case Management Conference, such as the parties' joint CMC statement and Rule 26 disclosures, are extended accordingly. Defendants' request for a stay pending an order on the motion to dismiss is denied. (This is a text-only entry; no document is associated with this entry) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 3, 2015 Filing 71 MOTION to Continue Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference and Extend Associated Deadlines Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Nadolenco, #2 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 70 Request for Judicial Notice re #69 MOTION to Dismiss filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #69 ) (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 11/9/2015. Replies due by 11/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Archis A. Parasharami. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren R. Goldman. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9890460.) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Parasharami, Archis) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9890392.) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldman, Lauren) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Hon. James Donato granting #60 Stipulation. Per the parties' stipulation, plaintiffs will file their opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss, if any, no later than November 9, 2015, and defendant will file its reply in support of any such motion no later than November 24, 2015. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stuart A. Davidson. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Dearman. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Paul J. Geller. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #44 Order Relating Case Opposition to motion to dismiss to be filed by 11/9; reply to motion to dismiss to be filed by 11/24 filed by ADAM PEZEN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Concerning Scheduling)(Bernstein, Joel) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9885736.) filed by Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Davidson, Stuart) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9885662.) filed by Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9885565.) filed by Nimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Geller, Paul) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alexander T.H. Nguyen. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jay Edelson. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to J. Dominick Larry. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9879483.) filed by Carlo Licata. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Nguyen, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9879401.) filed by Carlo Licata. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Edelson, Jay) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9879335.) filed by Carlo Licata. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Larry, James) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ross M. Kamhi(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015) Modified on 9/23/2015 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Corban S. Rhodes. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joel H. Bernstein. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9846405.) filed by ADAM PEZEN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kamhi, Ross) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9846348.) filed by ADAM PEZEN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rhodes, Corban) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9846301.) filed by ADAM PEZEN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bernstein, Joel) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/3/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015) Modified on 9/9/2015 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2015 Filing 43 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases Re 15-cv-3749-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/1/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR DETERMINATION OF RELATED STATUS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/31/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE by Nimesh Patel re #40 Amended Complaint Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Facebook Inc.. Filed byNimesh Patel. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #37 MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 in Connection with Related and Consolidated Actions Stipulation and [Proposed] Order in Connection with Consolidated Action filed by Nimesh Patel. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 38 Declaration of Shawn A. Williams in Support of #37 MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 in Connection with Related and Consolidated Actions filed byNimesh Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 37 MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 in Connection with Related and Consolidated Actions filed by Nimesh Patel. Responses due by 9/11/2015. Replies due by 9/18/2015. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2015. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/28/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. James Donato. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/27/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 33 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc... (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 32 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2015 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 18, 2015 Filing 31 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:15-cv-04265. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 12, 2015 Filing 30 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California in San Francisco the electronic record. (kp, )
July 29, 2015 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: In accordance with the Court's Order #42 entered in the lead case 15cv3484 Pezen v. Facebook, Inc., the Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the Northern District of California in San Francisco. All previously set deadlines and hearing dates are vacated. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ep, )
July 14, 2015 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Hearings set for 7/14/15 are stricken. Defendant's motion to transfer #23 is entered and continued. Plaintiff's shall file their response by 7/31/2015. Defendant's shall reply by 8/14/2015. Status hearing set for 8/27/15 at 9:15 AM. Mailed notice (lcw, )
July 8, 2015 Filing 27 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Michael Frisch (only) by Facebook, Inc. (Frisch, Michael)
July 1, 2015 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Archis A. Parasharami (Parasharami, Archis)
July 1, 2015 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Vincent J. Connelly (Connelly, Vincent)
July 1, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Lauren R Goldman for presentment of motion to transfer case #23 before Honorable James B. Zagel on 7/14/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Goldman, Lauren)
July 1, 2015 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc. to transfer case (Goldman, Lauren)
July 1, 2015 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Lauren R Goldman (Goldman, Lauren)
July 1, 2015 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Facebook, Inc. in support of motion to change venue #23 (Goldman, Lauren)
July 1, 2015 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Jeremy Jordan regarding motion to change venue #23 Declaration of Jeremy Jordan in Support of Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Goldman, Lauren)
July 1, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc. to change venue (Goldman, Lauren) Modified Modified by the clerk's office on 7/1/2015. Incorrect pdf uploaded. Motion on #23 7/1/2015 (jl, ).
June 30, 2015 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nimesh Patel by Paul Jeffrey Geller (Geller, Paul)
June 30, 2015 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #16 is granted. Attorney Paul J. Geller is granted leave to appear on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel's previous Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #15 is terminated as moot. Mailed notice (ep, )
June 30, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10812500. (Geller, Paul)
June 10, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10737190. (Geller, Paul)
June 9, 2015 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nimesh Patel by Mark J. Dearman (Dearman, Mark)
June 9, 2015 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nimesh Patel by Stuart Andrew Davidson (Davidson, Stuart)
May 28, 2015 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable James B. Zagel: Status hearing set for 7/14/15 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (ep, )
May 21, 2015 Filing 11 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable James B. Zagel for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Signed by Executive Committee on 05/21/2015.(rm, )
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 7/14/2015 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 7/7/2015. Motion by Stuart A. Davidson to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted. Motion by David Hall to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Motion by Shawn A. Williams to appear pro hac vice #7 is granted. Motion by Mark J. Dearman to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 5/21/2015. (rm, )
May 18, 2015 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Facebook, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 5/18/2015, answer due 7/17/2015. (Goldman, Lauren)
May 18, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10652929. (Dearman, Mark)
May 18, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10652825. (Williams, Shawn)
May 15, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10650623. (Hall, David)
May 15, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-10647902. (Davidson, Stuart)
May 15, 2015 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Facebook, Inc. (pg, )
May 14, 2015 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nimesh Patel by Frank Anthony Richter (Richter, Frank)
May 14, 2015 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nimesh Patel by James E Barz (Barz, James)
May 14, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barz, James)
May 14, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Illinois Biometric Information Privacy Act filed by Nimesh Patel; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10643762.(Barz, James)
May 14, 2015 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary Rowland. (jn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Facebook Biometric Information Privacy Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nimesh Patel
Represented By: Paul Jeffrey Geller
Represented By: Alexander Nguyen
Represented By: Alexander Glenn Tievsky
Represented By: Amanda M. Frame
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Corban S Rhodes
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Ellen Anne Gusikoff-Stewart
Represented By: Frank Anthony Richter,
Represented By: J. Dominick Larry
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: John Hamilton George
Represented By: Lucas F. Olts
Represented By: Mark Dearman
Represented By: Mark J. Dearman
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Randi D. Bandman
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Represented By: James E Barz,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Pezen
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Alexander Nguyen
Represented By: Alexander Glenn Tievsky
Represented By: Amanda M. Frame
Represented By: Corban S Rhodes
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Ellen Anne Gusikoff-Stewart
Represented By: J. Dominick Larry
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Joel H. Bernstein
Represented By: Lawrence A. Sucharow
Represented By: Lucas F. Olts
Represented By: Mark R Winston
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Randi D. Bandman
Represented By: Ross M. Kamhi
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Licata
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Alexander Nguyen
Represented By: Alexander Glenn Tievsky
Represented By: Amanda M. Frame
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: Corban S Rhodes
Represented By: David William Hall
Represented By: Ellen Anne Gusikoff-Stewart
Represented By: J. Dominick Larry
Represented By: Lily E. Hough
Represented By: Lucas F. Olts
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Represented By: Paul J. Geller
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Randi D. Bandman
Represented By: Stuart Andrew Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Vincent J. Connelly
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Represented By: Archis Ashok Parasharami
Represented By: Jeffrey Gutkin
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: Lauren R Goldman
Represented By: Matthew David Provance
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Richard E Nowak
Represented By: Vincent Connelly
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Levi & Korsinsky, LLP
Represented By: Adam Marc Apton
Represented By: Gregory Mark Nespole
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Frederick William Gullen
Represented By: David Philip Milian
Represented By: Frank S Hedin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clayton P. Zellmer
Represented By: Albert Y. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Scott Schinder
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Dawn Frankfother
Represented By: Kendrick Michael Jan
Represented By: John Jacob Pentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Cathy Flanagan
Represented By: Kendrick Michael Jan
Represented By: John Jacob Pentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kara Ross
Represented By: Paul Camarena
Represented By: Amie Denise Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?