Smith v. VMware, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dane Smith
Defendant: VMware, Inc. and Carahsoft Technology Corp.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03750
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 94 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF DANE SMITHS MOTION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD: Responses due by 11/1/2017; Replies due by 11/10/2017; Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
January 5, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting 76 Motion to Compel Arbitration, and dismissing without prejudice. Signed on 01/05/16. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
October 22, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING AND VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 76 MOTION to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. VMware, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane Smith
Represented By: Justin Theodore Berger
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Mark P. Friedlander, Jr.
Represented By: Shauna R Madison
Represented By: Niall Padraic McCarthy
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VMware, Inc.
Represented By: Lynne C. Hermle
Represented By: Jessica R. Perry
Represented By: Shannon Brooke Seekao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carahsoft Technology Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?