IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. et al v. Blackberry Limited et al

Plaintiff: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. and IXI IP, LLC
Defendant: BlackBerry Limited and BlackBerry Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv03754
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2015 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 110 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mark W. Halderman (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 28, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 116 Motion to Expedite Hearing Date of Case Management Conference (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
September 25, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 107 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Shaun Hassett. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 24, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jason Cook (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
August 25, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd. et al v. Blackberry Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IXI Mobile (R&D) Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas Steven Biemer
Represented By: Gary David Colby
Represented By: Jennifer S. Coleman
Represented By: Marie-Theres DiFillippo
Represented By: Mark William Halderman
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Aleksandr Korzh
Represented By: John V. Picone, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: Joshua David Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IXI IP, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Steven Biemer
Represented By: Gary David Colby
Represented By: Jennifer S. Coleman
Represented By: Marie-Theres DiFillippo
Represented By: Mark William Halderman
Represented By: John Joseph Higson
Represented By: Aleksandr Korzh
Represented By: John V. Picone, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Represented By: Joshua David Wolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackBerry Limited
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Jason W. Cook
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Franklin Devin Kang
Represented By: Brian Charles Riopelle
Represented By: Derek H. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlackBerry Corporation
Represented By: Marshall Beil
Represented By: Jason W. Cook
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Franklin Devin Kang
Represented By: Brian Charles Riopelle
Represented By: Derek H. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?