PAX Labs, Inc. v. Philip Morris USA Inc.

Plaintiff: PAX Labs, Inc.
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03766
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN M. NADING PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2015)
September 4, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 21 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
September 1, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONFOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ATTORNEY JULIA L. MAZUR by Hon. William Alsup granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 31, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY JULIA L. MAZUR by Hon. William Alsup denying 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAX Labs, Inc. v. Philip Morris USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAX Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Floyd A. Mandell
Represented By: Julia L. Mazur
Represented By: Joel Robert Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth King Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?