Walker v. B&G Foods, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Troy Walker
Defendant: B&G Foods, Inc. and B&G Foods North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03772
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND STAYING REMAINING CLAIMS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 20, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 38 MOTION to Vacate January 27, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by B&G Foods North America, Inc., B&G Foods, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
December 21, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by B&G Foods North America, Inc., B&G Foods, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
November 3, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. B&G Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Walker
Represented By: David Elliot
Represented By: Gregory Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&G Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Rebecca Bain Cross
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&G Foods North America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Rebecca Bain Cross
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?