Monica Sud v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Monica Sud
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation, Charoen Pokphand Foods, PCL and C.P. Food Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03783
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 80 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, and GRANTING 81 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Charoen Pokphand Foods, PCL, C.P. Food Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 24, 2017. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 15, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
December 17, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 71 STIPULATION to Adjourn Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/17/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 14, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/14/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 11, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Show Cause Response due by 12/15/2015. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/11/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
November 16, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 40 Motion to Change Time and for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Motion to be filed forthwith. Opposition due by 12/4/2015. Replies due by 12/10/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 16, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
October 6, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 24 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule. Motion to Dismiss (if any) due by 10/30/2015. Responses due by 11/17/2015. Replies due by 12/7/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/6/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015) Modified on 10/6/2015 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/2/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monica Sud v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Sud
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Represented By: Shauna R Madison
Represented By: Niall Padraic McCarthy
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Mulligan
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charoen Pokphand Foods, PCL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.P. Food Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?