Irma Ramirez v. Fulton Market Place S.C.

Plaintiff: Irma Ramirez
Defendant: Fulton Market Place S.C.
Case Number: 3:2015cv03793
Filed: August 19, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; ORDER THEREON by Hon. William Alsup granting 41 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
October 13, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION AS MOOT by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 30 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 3, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/6/2016.. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/3/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
August 30, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND EXTEND DEADLINES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 26, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ADA CLAIM AND RETAINING SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER STATE LAW CLAIMS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
March 8, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS THIRD SEPARATE AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
November 24, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION RE CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO CONDUCT THE JOINT SITE INSPECTION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 17, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/17/15. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irma Ramirez v. Fulton Market Place S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Market Place S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?